Global Patent Index - EP 1065966 A1

EP 1065966 A1 2001-01-10 - METHOD FOR EXAMINING BIOLOGICAL VESSELS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR EXAMINING BIOLOGICAL VESSELS

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR UNTERSUCHUNG VON BIOLOGISCHEN GEFÄSSEN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'EXAMEN DE VAISSEAUX BIOLOGIQUES

Publication

EP 1065966 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 97951063 A

Priority

  • DE 9702634 W
  • DE 19648935 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19648935A1] The present invention pertains to a device for examining biological vessels, especially retinal vessels, including an evaluation unit in the form of an image manipulator (BM) enabling at least partial digitalization or isolation of a measurement window, whereby at least one vessel segment is represented by an electronic picture or picture sequence, which is then transferred to said evaluaton unit.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 3/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 3/12 (2006.01); A61B 3/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 3/1233 (2013.01); Y10S 128/922 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9823202A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19648935 A1 19980528; DE 19648935 B4 20080515; EP 1065966 A1 20010110; JP 2000504256 A 20000411; JP 4140738 B2 20080827; US 6621917 B1 20030916; WO 9823202 A1 19980604

INPADOC legal status


2011-12-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20110629

2011-01-19 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD FOR EXAMINING BIOLOGICAL VESSELS

2009-11-04 [19U] DATE OF INTERRUPTION (INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20090601

2009-11-04 [19W] DATE OF RESUMPTION (AFTER INTERRUPTION OF PROCEEDINGS) BEFORE GRANT

- Effective date: 20100409

2004-12-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20041014

2002-01-09 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: IMEDOS INTELLIGENTE OPTISCHE SYSTEME DER MEDEZIN-

2002-01-09 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IMEDOS INTELLIGENTE OPTISCHE SYSTEME DER MEDEZIN-

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000323

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL SE