Global patent index - EP 1065972 A1

EP 1065972 A1 2001-01-10 - METHOD OF DISPLAYING MULTIPLE NON-INTERACTING LAYERS OF PATIENT DATA USING A SINGLE PLANE VIDEO SCREEN

Title (en)

METHOD OF DISPLAYING MULTIPLE NON-INTERACTING LAYERS OF PATIENT DATA USING A SINGLE PLANE VIDEO SCREEN

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR DARSTELLUNG MEHRFACHER WECHSELWIRKUNGSFREIER PATIENTENDATENSCHICHTEN AUF EINEM BILDSCHIRM MIT EINER EBENE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'AFFICHAGE DE PLUSIEURS COUCHES NON INTERACTIVES DE DONNEES SUR LES MALADES AU MOYEN D'UN ECRAN VIDEO A PLAN UNIQUE

Publication

EP 1065972 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00903189 A

Priority

  • US 0000463 W
  • US 23543499 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0042913A1] A method and apparatus of displaying multiple layers of patient data, including waveform data and background data, using a single plane video monitor is claimed. A patient waveform is generated on the display of a video monitor. A background display data array is generated for producing a background display on the video monitor. At least a portion of the background display data array is copied to the video monitor such that the background display is regenerated at substantially the same time as the patient waveform is generated on the video monitor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61B 5/044

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/00 (2006.01); A61B 5/044 (2006.01); G09G 5/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61B 5/044 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0042913A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 0042913 A1 20000727; EP 1065972 A1 20010110; JP 2002535028 A 20021022

INPADOC legal status

2004-05-19 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20030927

2003-07-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030516

2001-03-28 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010129

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE