Global Patent Index - EP 1066035 A4

EP 1066035 A4 2001-05-09 - SUBSTITUTED AROMATIC COMPOUNDS FOR TREATMENT OF ANTIBIOTIC RESISTANT INFECTIONS

Title (en)

SUBSTITUTED AROMATIC COMPOUNDS FOR TREATMENT OF ANTIBIOTIC RESISTANT INFECTIONS

Title (de)

SUBSTITUIERTE AROMATISCHE VERBINDUNGEN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON ANTIBIOTIKA-RESISTENTEN INFEKTIONEN.

Title (fr)

COMPOSES AROMATIQUES SUBSTITUES POUR LE TRAITEMENT D'INFECTIONS RESISTANT AUX ANTIBIOTIQUES

Publication

EP 1066035 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99911497 A

Priority

  • US 9906494 W
  • US 7938398 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: GB2333454A] This invention relates to compounds of the general formula: wherein A is a aromatic hydrocarbon ring system and R 1 is a carbon bound directly to an oxygen and is also bound to a nitrogen through a saturated carbon and wherein at least one of R 2 , R 3 and R 4 is an electron-rich substituent. The active agents are useful for treating patients suffering from infections including gram positive organisms, such as streptococcus, staphylococcus, anthracis, gram negative bacteria such as neisseria species, yeasts and mycobacterium. They are effective against strains which have shown resistance to other antimicrobial agents.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 31/35; A61K 31/4458; A61P 31/00; C07C 215/28; C07C 215/30; C07D 211/22; C07D 498/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/137 (2006.01); A61K 31/424 (2006.01); A61K 31/4458 (2006.01); A61K 45/00 (2006.01); A61P 31/04 (2006.01); A61P 31/10 (2006.01); C07C 215/28 (2006.01); C07C 215/30 (2006.01); C07D 211/22 (2006.01); C07D 498/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 215/30 (2013.01); A61K 31/137 (2013.01); A61K 31/4458 (2013.01); C07C 215/28 (2013.01); C07D 211/22 (2013.01); C07C 2603/24 (2017.05); C07C 2603/26 (2017.05)

Citation (search report)

  • [X] US 4327022 A 19820427 - BAILEY DENIS M
  • [DX] US 5711966 A 19980127 - WOOSLEY RAYMOND [US], et al
  • [X] EP 0026298 A1 19810408 - AMERICAN CYANAMID CO [US]
  • [X] MOLNAR, JOSEF ET AL: "New plasmid curing compounds. Anthril and phenathril derivatives", BIOCHEM. PHARMACOL. (1979), 28(2), 261-5, XP000982741
  • [X] KIM, KI HWAN ET AL: "Quantitative structure-activity relationships in 1-aryl-2- (alkylamino)ethanol antimalarials", J. MED. CHEM. (1979), 22(4), 366-91, XP002162013
  • [X] GILLESPIE, J. SAMUEL, JR. ET AL: "Antimalarials. 3. 3-Substituted 1-naphthalenemethanols", J. MED. CHEM. (1975), 18(12), 1223-7, XP002162014
  • [X] CHILDS, G. E. ET AL: "Comparison of in vitro and in vivo antimalarial activities of 9-phenanthrenecarbinols", ANN. TROP. MED. PARASITOL. (1984), 78(1), 13-20, XP000982721
  • See also references of WO 9948461A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

GB 2333454 A 19990728; GB 2333454 B 20000809; GB 9909183 D0 19990616; AU 3012699 A 19991018; CA 2325689 A1 19990930; EP 1066035 A2 20010110; EP 1066035 A4 20010509; JP 2002507557 A 20020312; WO 9948461 A2 19990930; WO 9948461 A3 19991216

INPADOC legal status


2004-03-17 [18D] APPLICATION DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20030916

2001-12-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011019

2001-05-09 [A4] DESPATCH OF SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010327

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7A 61K 31/35 A, 7C 07D 211/22 B, 7C 07D 498/04 B, 7A 61K 31/4458 B, 7A 61P 31/00 B, 7C 07C 215/28 B, 7C 07C 215/30 B

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE