Global Patent Index - EP 1066061 A1

EP 1066061 A1 2001-01-10 - USE OF SCATTER FACTOR TO ENHANCE ANGIOGENESIS

Title (en)

USE OF SCATTER FACTOR TO ENHANCE ANGIOGENESIS

Title (de)

VERWENDUNG EINES DISPERSIONSFAKTORS ZUR VERSTÄRKUNG DER ANGIOGENESE

Title (fr)

UTILISATION DU FACTEUR DE DISPERSION POUR FAVORISER L'ANGIOGENESE

Publication

EP 1066061 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99914117 A

Priority

  • US 9906452 W
  • US 4881398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948537A1] This invention relates to a method of enhancing wound healing and to a method of enhancing organ transplantation utilizing scatter factor, either alone or in combination with a growth factor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A61K 48/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 48/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/18 (2006.01); A61P 9/00 (2006.01); A61P 9/14 (2006.01); A61P 17/02 (2006.01); A61P 43/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A61K 38/1833 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948537 A1 19990930; AU 3202999 A 19991018; CA 2326053 A1 19990930; EP 1066061 A1 20010110; EP 1066061 A4 20030108; JP 2002507584 A 20020312; MX PA00009440 A 20030422

INPADOC legal status


2005-01-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040702

2004-04-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040220

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: GOLDBERG, ITZHAK, D.

2003-05-21 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: ROSEN, ELIOT, M.

2003-01-08 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20021121

2003-01-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE