Global Patent Index - EP 1066113 A2

EP 1066113 A2 2001-01-10 - DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PRELIMINARY DISINTEGRATION OF FIBROUS PLANTS AND FOR SHORTENING THE SAME AS WELL AS FOR SEPARATING FIBRES AND WOOD CHIPS

Title (en)

DEVICE AND METHOD FOR THE PRELIMINARY DISINTEGRATION OF FIBROUS PLANTS AND FOR SHORTENING THE SAME AS WELL AS FOR SEPARATING FIBRES AND WOOD CHIPS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR VORAUFLÖSUNG UND ABKÜRZUNG VON FASERGEWÄCHSEN SOWIE ZUM TRENNEN VON FASERN UND HOLZTEILEN

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ET PROCEDE POUR EFFECTUER UNE DESAGREGATION PREALABLE DE PLANTES FIBREUSES ET RACCOURCIR CES DERNIERES, ET POUR SEPARER DES FIBRES ET DES FRAGMENTS DE BOIS

Publication

EP 1066113 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99922046 A

Priority

  • DE 9900779 W
  • DE 19813397 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813397A1] The present invention relates to a device and a method for carrying out a preliminary disintegration of the stem before the harvest cut or the shortening cut in order to recover the fibrous material. The purpose of this invention is accelerate the material drying process and to limit as much as possible the loading of the complex fibre-extraction machine with secondary non-fibrous components in order to reduce the power consumption, to improve the ecological characteristics and to increase the output of said machine. The preliminary disintegration is performed by integrating new appropriate tools and functions in the rotor of the shortening machine. The non-fibrous constituents produced during the preliminary disintegration are separated using a new open and swinging needle-bar conveyor together with fast-rotating venting and drawing cylinders.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B02C 1/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D01B 1/14 (2006.01); D01B 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D01B 1/14 (2013.01); D01B 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948609A2

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813397 A1 19991007; AT 223258 T 20020915; AU 3925299 A 19991018; CA 2326160 A1 19990930; DE 19980469 D2 20010412; EP 1066113 A2 20010110; EP 1066113 B1 20020904; ES 2183552 T3 20030316; US 6719225 B1 20040413; WO 9948609 A2 19990930; WO 9948609 A3 19991223

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060331

2007-12-31 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HESCH ROLF

- Effective date: 20050331

2007-01-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20061130

2006-10-03 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061003

2006-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20050319

2006-03-18 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060318

2005-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-11-30 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20051001

2005-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *HESCH ROLF

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-19 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050319

2005-03-18 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-03-18 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050318

2005-03-18 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-12-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20041228

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20040324

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-22 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20040322

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-03-17 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20040317

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-25 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20040225

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-08-27 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030605

2003-03-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2183552 T3

2002-12-31 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021205

2002-10-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902563 20021010

2002-09-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL

2002-09-04 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 223258 T 20020915

2002-01-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011123

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE DE ES FR GB IT NL