Global Patent Index - EP 1066125 A1

EP 1066125 A1 2001-01-10 - ROLLER

Title (en)

ROLLER

Title (de)

WALZE

Title (fr)

ROULEAU

Publication

EP 1066125 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98965844 A

Priority

  • DE 19802723 A
  • EP 9808260 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19802723A1] The invention relates to a flexion-controllable roller (100), comprising a plurality of inner support elements (10) that can be individually controlled by valves. The valves comprise actuators (80) with a shaped body (90) that changes its expansion in at least one dimension when an electrical current is applied. Said change serves to control the valves (50).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B21B 13/14; B41F 13/18; F16K 31/00; F16K 31/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B41F 13/08 (2006.01); D21G 1/02 (2006.01); F16C 13/00 (2006.01); F16K 31/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F16C 13/028 (2013.01); B41F 13/08 (2013.01); D21G 1/022 (2013.01); F16K 31/008 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9937416A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE ES FI FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19802723 A1 19990812; CA 2319244 A1 19990729; EP 1066125 A1 20010110; WO 9937416 A1 19990729

INPADOC legal status


2003-01-02 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20020701

2001-10-17 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: EDUARD KUESTERS MASCHINENFABRIK GMBH & CO. KG

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010411

2001-03-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 21B 13/14 A, 7F 16K 31/00 B, 7F 16K 31/02 B, 7B 41F 13/18 B, 7B 41F 13/08 B, 7D 21G 1/02 B

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000524

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT DE ES FI FR GB IT SE