Global patent index - EP 1066138 A1

EP 1066138 A1 2001-01-10 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A PROFILED MATERIAL

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR PRODUCING A PROFILED MATERIAL

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES PROFILMATERIALES

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE FABRIQUER UN MATERIAU PROFILE

Publication

EP 1066138 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913293 A

Priority

  • DE 19813028 A
  • DE 19826408 A
  • DE 19838187 A
  • EP 9901988 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948659A1] The invention relates to a method and device for producing a profile out of a mixture of small parts in which the mixture is pressed through a channel device which determines the cross-section of the profile. The mixture is heated in a heating channel section and is moved through the heating channel section up to a channel exit area while the mixture partially bonds. The mixture is then extracted from the channel exit area as a profile exhibiting an adequate dimensional stability. According to the invention, the mixture is guided in the channel device, into an area which is located after the heating channel section in the direction of movement, and through a hot gas zone. In said hot gas zone, an area of an extruded section which is pressed out of the heating channel section is impinged upon by pressurized hot gas and heated up to a bonding temperature. As a result, it is possible to produce extrusion profiles with an improved effectiveness in an advantageous manner.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B27N 3/28; B27N 3/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B27N 3/28 (2006.01); B30B 11/24 (2006.01); B30B 15/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B30B 15/34 (2013.01); B27N 3/28 (2013.01); B30B 11/24 (2013.01); B30B 11/246 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948659A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT DE NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948659 A1 19990930; AT 349305 T 20070115; AU 3147299 A 19991018; AU 3521299 A 19991018; AU 3811799 A 19991018; DE 19980473 D2 20010621; DE 19980474 D2 20010726; DE 19980475 D2 20010712; DE 59914093 D1 20070208; EP 1066138 A1 20010110; EP 1066138 B1 20061227; EP 1068068 A1 20010117; EP 1068069 A1 20010117; WO 9948675 A1 19990930; WO 9948676 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status

2012-09-15 [REG AT MA03] REVOCATION OF THE PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: MA03

- Ref Document Number: 349305

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20120425

2012-08-23 [REG DE R107] PUBLICATION OF GRANT OF EUROPEAN PATENT RESCINDED

- Ref Legal Event Code: R107

- Ref Document Number: 59914093

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20120823

2012-07-04 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20120425

2012-05-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20120331

- Year of fee payment: 14

2012-04-25 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R064

- Ref Document Number: 59914093

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2012-04-25 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: R103

- Ref Document Number: 59914093

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2008-06-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070323

2007-08-22 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: ANTON HEGGENSTALLER GMBH

- Effective date: 20070712

2007-06-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2007-03-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070327

2007-02-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59914093

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2007-02-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-12-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL SE

2006-12-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20061227

2006-02-01 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SCHEDLBAUER, KARL

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2006-02-01 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: SCHEDLBAUER, KARL

2004-01-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20031201

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT DE NL SE