Global Patent Index - EP 1066139 B1

EP 1066139 B1 2002-11-13 - TILE-CUTTING MACHINE WITH A TILE-POSITIONING PARALLEL AND DIAGONAL LINEAR GRATING

Title (en)

TILE-CUTTING MACHINE WITH A TILE-POSITIONING PARALLEL AND DIAGONAL LINEAR GRATING

Title (de)

FLIESENSCHNEIDEMASCHINE MIT FLIESSENPOSITIONIER-PARALLEL- UND DIAGONAL-LINIENGITTER

Title (fr)

DECOUPEUSE DE CARREAUX A QUADRILLAGE ORTHOGONAL ET DIAGONAL POUR LE POSITIONNEMENT DES CARREAUX

Publication

EP 1066139 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99919063 A

Priority

  • DE 9900660 W
  • DE 29804733 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9947323A1] The invention relates to a tile-cutting machine, comprising a rectangular machine plate (1) on which a pivotable cutter rail (5) with a cutter arm (7) and a longitudinal strip (9) with a scale (10) are located. The invention is characterised in that a rectangular positioning plate (15) is fixed on the surface of the machine plate (1), resting against the strip (9). Said positioning plate has a linear grating (20, 30) on the side pointing upwards, i.e. the side on which the workpiece is placed. Advantageously, said linear grating can have a parallel linear grating (20, 21, 22) and a diagonal linear grating (39, 31, 32).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B28D 1/22

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B28D 1/225 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

DE 29804733 U1 19980610; AT 227629 T 20021115; AU 3698899 A 19991011; EP 1066139 A1 20010110; EP 1066139 B1 20021113; WO 9947323 A1 19990923

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59903400

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140331

- Year of fee payment: 16

2006-03-04 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060304

2005-11-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2005-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050331

2005-03-22 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20050322

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-03-23 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20040323

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-11-05 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030814

2003-08-29 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-05-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030529

2003-05-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Effective date: 20021113

2003-02-28 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: PATENTANWAELTE FELDMANN & PARTNER AG

2002-12-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59903400 20021219

2002-11-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-11-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI

2002-11-13 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-11-13 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021113

2002-11-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 227629 T 20021115

2002-07-03 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BRANDMEIER, JOHANN

2002-07-03 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BRANDMEIER, JOHANN

2002-06-12 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020424

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FR GB IT LI