Global Patent Index - EP 1066154 A1

EP 1066154 A1 2001-01-10 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING BAGS

Title (en)

METHOD FOR PRODUCING BAGS

Title (de)

BEUTELHERSTELLVERFAHREN

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION DE SACS

Publication

EP 1066154 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911772 A

Priority

  • DE 19812739 A
  • EP 9901580 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812739A1] The invention relates to a method and a device for continuously producing, handling and filling bags (8), especially bags for handling by automatic machines, formed from a thermoplastic line of film. The aim of the invention is to facilitate handling in the logistical sequence between the bags (8) being produced and being filled and to improve the quality of the bag stacks (6). To this end, the bags (8) are attached (22) in places, then held in place in the area of a packing machine by holding elements (31) which interact with suspension holes (18). The attachment (22) on the bag stack (6) is then removed, after which the bags (8) are filled. The filling movement releases the bags (8) from the holding elements (31) and the bags (8) are finally sealed. The bags (8) are advantageously separated by a clamping and pulling-apart apparatus located in the area of the packing machine.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B31B 19/98

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B31B 19/98 (2006.01); B65B 43/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65B 43/14 (2013.01); B31B 70/984 (2017.08); B31B 70/988 (2017.08)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812739 A1 19990930; AU 2702999 A 19991018; EP 1066154 A1 20010110; EP 1066154 B1 20020508; US 6453646 B1 20020924; WO 9948677 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2009-02-27 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080331

2009-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20081001

2008-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *LEMO MASCHINENBAU G.M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20080331

2008-01-02 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20070419

- Year of fee payment: 9

2007-03-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20070316

- Year of fee payment: 9

2003-12-01 [NLV4] NL: LAPSED OR ANULLED DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-10-01 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031001

2003-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030211

2002-06-13 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901403 20020613

2002-05-08 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE NL

2001-07-25 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010607

2001-06-13 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31B 19/98 A, 7B 65B 43/14 B

2001-06-13 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING BAGS

2001-03-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7B 31B 19/98 A, 7B 65B 43/14 B

2001-03-21 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PRODUCING BAGS

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000826

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE NL