Global Patent Index - EP 1066200 B1

EP 1066200 B1 2001-12-12 - BAG WITH SELF-CLOSURE

Title (en)

BAG WITH SELF-CLOSURE

Title (de)

SELBSTSCHLIESSENDER SACK

Title (fr)

SAC AVEC AUTO-FERMETURE

Publication

EP 1066200 B1 (FR)

Application

EP 99911862 A

Priority

  • FR 9900768 W
  • FR 9804406 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776990A1] The invention concerns a bag (1) comprising an envelope (2) closed on one side by a base (3), and defining a hole (4) on the other side, containing a load (5) capable of passing, for example by gravity, through said hole, when said bag is turned upside down, said envelope (2) being so shaped on itself at said hole to close said bag. The invention is characterised in that, on the side opposite to the base (3), the envelope (2) has a shape, in particular a folding line, successively obtainable by: folding outwards, then folding inwards, the bag opening (4) edges (2a), to form a tucked up flap (2b) extended by an outer envelope (2c); folding the flap (2b) parallel edges (2d) brought closer, to form at least one fold (7) closing the bag internally; folding the outer envelope (2c) parallel edges (2e) brought closer, to form at least one fold (9) for closing the bag internally. The invention also concerns a bag (1) as per claim 1, characterised in that the bag (1) internal closure fold (7) and/or the bag (1) external closure fold (9) are welded, bonded or pressed.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 33/16; B65D 77/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 33/24 (2006.01); B65D 33/16 (2006.01); B65D 77/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 77/14 (2013.01); B65D 33/16 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776990 A1 19991008; FR 2776990 B1 20000519; AU 3039999 A 19991025; DE 69900598 D1 20020124; DE 69900598 T2 20020529; EP 1066200 A1 20010110; EP 1066200 B1 20011212; JP 2002510586 A 20020409; JP 4271856 B2 20090603; US 6793392 B1 20040921; WO 9951505 A1 19991014

INPADOC legal status


2018-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20180326

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20180321

- Year of fee payment: 20

2018-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 20

2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170321

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20170324

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2003-06-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-03 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-01-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69900598 20020124

2002-01-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20011212

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: MICHELI & CIE INGENIEURS-CONSEILS

2001-12-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2001-12-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-12-12 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20011212

2001-03-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000926

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE