Global Patent Index - EP 1066202 A1

EP 1066202 A1 2001-01-10 - REMOVABLE ELEMENT FOR PROTECTING A PRODUCT PROJECTING PART AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH AN ELEMENT

Title (en)

REMOVABLE ELEMENT FOR PROTECTING A PRODUCT PROJECTING PART AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH AN ELEMENT

Title (de)

SCHUTZELEMENT FÜR PRODUKTE MIT ERHABENEN OBERFLÄCHEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES SOLCHEN ELEMENTES

Title (fr)

ELEMENT DE PROTECTION AMOVIBLE D'UNE PARTIE EN SAILLIE D'UN PRODUIT ET PROCEDE DE REALISATION D'UN TEL ELEMENT

Publication

EP 1066202 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 99909082 A

Priority

  • FR 9900686 W
  • FR 9803755 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: FR2776626A1] The invention concerns a removable element for protecting a product projecting part such as a reservoir or bottle tap, in the form of a sleeve, designed to be pulled onto the projecting part to be heat shrunk on said part. The sleeve (4) is preformed according to the projecting part (mandrel 2) general shape before being pulled onto said projecting part. One sleeve (4, 4A) end (41; 424A) and a certain length (423A) thereof starting from said end, have a cross-section slightly greater than the projecting part (2) largest cross section. The sleeve other end has a recessed edge (422A) with free opening (421A) with smaller cross-section than the projecting part free end.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B65D 55/08; B65D 75/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/08 (2006.01); B65D 75/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B65D 55/0854 (2013.01); B65D 75/002 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948767A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES GR IE IT PT

EPO simple patent family

FR 2776626 A1 19991001; FR 2776626 B1 20000428; AU 2845399 A 19991018; EP 1066202 A1 20010110; EP 1066202 B1 20030813; ES 2205785 T3 20040501; PT 1066202 E 20031231; TR 200002777 T2 20001221; WO 9948767 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070324

2008-10-31 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20061002

2007-06-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20060325

2006-03-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060331

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-03-25 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060325

2005-12-29 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2005-09-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050926

2005-03-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20050329

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-03-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050324

2005-03-18 [PGFP GR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Payment date: 20050318

- Year of fee payment: 7

2004-08-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040514

2004-05-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2205785 T3

2004-03-05 [PGFP IE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Payment date: 20040305

- Year of fee payment: 6

2004-02-27 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20040227

- Year of fee payment: 6

2003-12-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20030404548

2003-09-17 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: FRENCH

2003-08-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): ES GR IE IT PT

2003-03-05 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REMOVABLE ELEMENT FOR PROTECTING A PRODUCT PROJECTING PART AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH ELEMENT

2003-01-08 [RTI1] TITLE (CORRECTION)

- Free text: REMOVABLE ELEMENT FOR PROTECTING A PRODUCT PROJECTING PART AND METHOD FOR PRODUCING SUCH ELEMENT

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010405

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): ES GR IE IT PT