Global patent index - EP 1066212 A1

EP 1066212 A1 2001-01-10 - ELEVATOR SYSTEM

Title (en)

ELEVATOR SYSTEM

Title (de)

AUFZUGSANLAGE

Title (fr)

SYSTEME DE MONTE-CHARGES

Publication

EP 1066212 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99903572 A

Priority

  • EP 99903572 A
  • CH 9900080 W
  • EP 98810153 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943586A1] The invention relates to an elevator system (1) comprising a payment device for allowing the use of the system as a means of transport which provides fee-paying transport services for persons and/or goods. The system also comprises an identification device (15) for recognizing non-cash means of payment, a calculation device (16) for the non-cash calculation of transport services, for example for destinations entered within a time window, and a debiting device (17) for the non-cash debiting of the cost of the transport services. The identification device (15) is able to recognize different non-cash means of payment such as tokens, tokens with electronic chips, value cards, cards or keys with data storage means or receiver/transmitter systems or biometrical systems containing individual data of the user. Payment for the transport services can be settled, for example, according to operation-specific and/or user-specific criteria.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 1/46; G07B 15/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 1/46 (2006.01); G07B 15/02 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07B 15/02 (2013.01); B66B 1/468 (2013.01); B66B 2201/4692 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9943586A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943586 A1 19990902; AR 019825 A1 20020320; AT 218499 T 20020615; AU 2407199 A 19990915; BR 9908240 A 20001031; CA 2321799 A1 19990902; CA 2321799 C 20070515; DE 59901635 D1 20020711; DK 1066212 T3 20020930; EP 1066212 A1 20010110; EP 1066212 B1 20020605; ES 2178380 T3 20021216; JP 2002504468 A 20020212; PT 1066212 E 20021129; US 6354405 B1 20020312; ZA 9901297 B 19990820

INPADOC legal status

2016-10-31 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160219

2016-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM01

- Ref Document Number: 218499

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

- Effective date: 20160219

2016-09-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EBP

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160226

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160225

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-02 [REG GB 746] REGISTER NOTED 'LICENCES OF RIGHT' (SECT. 46/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 746

- Effective date: 20160209

2016-02-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-02-12 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59901635

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: QIP PATENTANWAELTE, DR. KUEHN & PARTNER MBB, DE

2016-02-11 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R084

- Ref Document Number: 59901635

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2015-05-29 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP FI] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150219

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150211

- Year of fee payment: 17

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-12-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2178380

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-11-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020904

2002-09-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: T3

2002-09-27 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020723

2002-07-11 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59901635

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-07-11

2002-06-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE

2002-06-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 218499

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-06-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010720

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL PT SE