Global patent index - EP 1066213 A1

EP 1066213 A1 2001-01-10 - ELEVATOR SYSTEM WITH OVERHEAD DRIVE MOTOR

Title (en)

ELEVATOR SYSTEM WITH OVERHEAD DRIVE MOTOR

Title (de)

AUFZUGSSYSTEM MIT OBENLIEGENDEM ANTRIEBSMOTOR

Title (fr)

SYSTEME ASCENSEUR AVEC LE MOTEUR D'ENTRAINEMENT MONTÉ EN HAUT

Publication

EP 1066213 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99936067 A

Priority

  • US 9903648 W
  • US 3110898 A
  • US 16321898 A
  • US 21899098 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9943593A1] An elevator system includes a hoistway defined in a surrounding structure, and an elevator car and at least one counterweight disposed in the hoistway. The hoistway defines an overhead space over a vertical extent of the hoistway between a ceiling of the hoistway and a top portion of the elevator car at its highest operable location along the hoistway. At least one drive motor is disposed in the overhead space and drivingly couples and suspends the elevator car via at least one flat rope or belt.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B66B 9/02; B66B 7/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B66B 7/00 (2006.01); B66B 7/02 (2006.01); B66B 7/06 (2006.01); B66B 7/08 (2006.01); B66B 7/10 (2006.01); B66B 9/02 (2006.01); B66B 11/00 (2006.01); B66B 13/30 (2006.01); B66B 17/12 (2006.01); D07B 1/06 (2006.01); D07B 1/16 (2006.01); D07B 1/22 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B66B 11/008 (2013.01); B66B 7/027 (2013.01); B66B 11/0035 (2013.01); B66B 17/12 (2013.01)

Citation (third parties)

Third party :

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9943593 A1 19990902; BR 9908230 A 20001031; CN 1313827 A 20010919; CN 1329273 C 20070801; DE 29924745 U1 20050609; DE 69931764 D1 20060720; DE 69931764 T2 20070606; EP 1066213 A1 20010110; EP 1066213 B1 20060607; ES 2262331 T3 20061116; HK 1039105 A1 20080314; JP 2002504471 A 20020212; PT 1066213 E 20060929

INPADOC legal status

2011-07-29 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110315

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110216

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110218

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-05-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20110203

- Year of fee payment: 13

2011-03-28 [REG PT MP4A] REFUSAL OF NATIONAL PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: MP4A

- Effective date: 20110324

2011-03-23 [27W] REVOKED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 27W

- Effective date: 20110215

2011-02-15 [REG DE R064] EPO'S REVOCATION DECISION NOW FINAL

- Ref Legal Event Code: R064

- Ref Document Number: 69931764

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2011-02-15 [REG DE R103] PATENT REVOKED BY EPO

- Ref Legal Event Code: R103

- Ref Document Number: 69931764

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2010-06-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20100226

- Year of fee payment: 12

2007-01-10 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26

- Opponent name: SCHINDLER AUFZUEGE UND FAHRTREPPEN GMBH

- Effective date: 20061110

2006-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2262331

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2006-10-13 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-09-29 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Effective date: 20060808

2006-07-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69931764

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-07-20

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-06-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2006-06-07 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060607

2004-05-19 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040331

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000926

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT