Global patent index - EP 1066215 A1

EP 1066215 A1 2001-01-10 - BLOW-OUT PREVENTING DEVICE FOR A SPEAR VALVE

Title (en)

BLOW-OUT PREVENTING DEVICE FOR A SPEAR VALVE

Title (de)

STEIGROHRSICHERUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE SURPRESSION DE SECURITE POUR SOUPAPE DE TIGE

Publication

EP 1066215 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911915 A

Priority

  • GB 9900892 W
  • GB 9806131 A
  • GB 9903466 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9948801A1] A keg has a spear fitted with a safety blow-out device (105, 106). Spring member (106) has three legs with outwardly turned ends (106d, 106e, 106f) that slot into equi-angularly spaced holes. The leg ends prevent the spear (101) from being extracted through the keg neck (102) since the diametrical extent of the legs is greater than the internal diameter of the neck. Appropriate relative axial movement of body (7) relative to tube (2) retracts leg ends (106d, 106e, 106f) within said neck internal diameter allowing extraction of the spear.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

B67D 1/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B67D 1/0831 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9948801A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9948801 A1 19990930; DE 69931153 D1 20060608; DE 69931153 T2 20060928; EP 1066215 A1 20010110; EP 1066215 B1 20060503

INPADOC legal status

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20160322

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150318

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-02-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101001

2011-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100331

2010-12-24 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20101130

2009-10-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090316

- Year of fee payment: 11

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20090319

- Year of fee payment: 11

2007-05-02 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20070206

2006-12-22 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-06-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69931153

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2006-06-08

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2006-05-03 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2006-05-03 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2006-01-11 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: SPEARS LIMITED

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-03-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20030115

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000919

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB