Global Patent Index - EP 1066238 A1

EP 1066238 A1 2001-01-10 - PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF ACETIC ACID

Title (en)

PROCESS FOR PRODUCTION OF ACETIC ACID

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON ESSIGSÄURE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE PRODUCTION D'ACIDE ACETIQUE

Publication

EP 1066238 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99919157 A

Priority

  • EP 9902163 W
  • US 8021198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950218A1] A process for producing acetic acid which comprises: charging reactants methanol or dimethyl ether or methyl acetate or any mixture thereof, into a reactor containing (1) a rhodium carbonylation catalyst, (2) an alkyl iodide or alkyl bromide and (3) a hydrogenation catalyst and contacting said reactants with carbon monoxide and hydrogen for the production.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07C 51/12; C07C 53/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07B 61/00 (2006.01); C07C 51/12 (2006.01); C07C 53/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07C 51/12 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

C07C 51/12 + C07C 53/08

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950218A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950218 A1 19991007; WO 9950218 B1 19991118; AU 3703199 A 19991018; CA 2325478 A1 19991007; CA 2325478 C 20060124; CN 1295551 A 20010516; DE 69936137 D1 20070705; DE 69936137 T2 20070906; EP 1066238 A1 20010110; EP 1066238 B1 20070523; ID 27613 A 20010412; JP 2002509901 A 20020402; JP 3545339 B2 20040721; KR 100378643 B1 20030403; RU 2203264 C2 20030427; US 6573403 B1 20030603; ZA 200005031 B 20011220

INPADOC legal status


2017-02-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160329

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160329

2017-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160401

2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20161001

2016-12-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161130

2016-11-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160329

2016-11-16 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160401

2016-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69936137

2016-08-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160331

2015-08-31 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150317

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150324

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-17 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2008-04-30 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20080226

2008-01-31 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070523

2007-10-26 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2007-09-03 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20070903

2007-07-05 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69936137 P 20070705

2007-05-23 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL

2007-05-23 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2005-04-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050314

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000929

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): BE DE DK ES FR GB IT NL