Global Patent Index - EP 1066272 A1

EP 1066272 A1 2001-01-10 - NOVEL COMPOUNDS USEFUL IN THE COMPLEMENT, COAGULAT AND KALLIKREIN PATHWAYS AND METHOD FOR THEIR PREPARATION

Title (en)

NOVEL COMPOUNDS USEFUL IN THE COMPLEMENT, COAGULAT AND KALLIKREIN PATHWAYS AND METHOD FOR THEIR PREPARATION

Title (de)

NEUE VERBINDUNGEN, DIE IM KOMPLEMENT-, KOAGULAT- UND KALLIKREIN-REAKTIONSWEG NÜTZLICH SIND UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER HERSTELLUNG

Title (fr)

NOUVEAUX COMPOSES UTILES DANS LES VOIES DU COMPLEMENT, DE LA COAGULATION ET DE LA KALLIKREINE ET LEUR PROCEDE DE PREPARATION

Publication

EP 1066272 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98926184 A

Priority

  • US 9811255 W
  • US 7966998 P

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07D 277/64; C07D 307/79; C07D 311/04; C07D 333/58

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A61K 31/34 (2006.01); A61K 31/35 (2006.01); A61K 31/425 (2006.01); C07D 277/64 (2006.01); C07D 277/82 (2006.01); C07D 307/79 (2006.01); C07D 311/04 (2006.01); C07D 333/58 (2006.01); C07D 407/12 (2006.01); C07D 411/12 (2006.01); C07D 417/12 (2006.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066272 A1 20010110; EP 1066272 A4 20020313

INPADOC legal status


2008-01-11 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Ref Legal Event Code: WD

- Ref Document Number: 1033941

- Country of Ref Document: HK

2003-03-26 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20020924

2002-06-26 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020513

2002-03-13 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: A4

- Effective date: 20020124

2002-03-13 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-29 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- Free Format Text: 7C 07D 277/64 A, 7C 07D 307/79 B, 7C 07D 311/04 B, 7C 07D 333/58 B, 7C 07D 407/12 B, 7C 07D 411/12 B, 7A 61K 31/34 B, 7A 61K 31/35 B, 7A 61K 31/425 B, 7C 07D 277/82 B, 7C 07D 417/12 B

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000926

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL PAYMENT 20000925;LT PAYMENT 20000925;LV PAYMENT 20000925;MK PAYMENT 20000925;RO PAYMENT 20000925;SI PAYMENT 20000925