Global Patent Index - EP 1066318 A1

EP 1066318 A1 2001-01-10 - NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES WHICH CODE PROTEINS INFLUENCING BONE DEVELOPMENT

Title (en)

NUCLEIC ACID MOLECULES WHICH CODE PROTEINS INFLUENCING BONE DEVELOPMENT

Title (de)

NUCLEINSÄUREMOLEKÜLE, CODIEREND PROTEINE, DIE DIE KNOCHENENTWICKLUNG BEEINFLUSSEN

Title (fr)

MOLECULE D'ACIDE NUCLEIQUE CODANT DES PROTEINES INFLUANT SUR LE DEVELOPPEMENT OSSEUX

Publication

EP 1066318 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913304 A

Priority

  • DE 19813799 A
  • EP 9902055 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9950284A2] The invention relates to nucleic acid molecules which code proteins influencing bone development in mammals, and to the corresponding coded proteins, antibodies and pharmaceutical and diagnostic compositions. The invention also relates to transgenic animals which express said proteins and to animals in which the corresponding gene is inactivated and which have an extension of the bone.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/47 (2006.01); A61K 48/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4702 (2013.01); A01K 2217/05 (2013.01); A01K 2217/075 (2013.01); A61K 48/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950284A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9950284 A2 19991007; WO 9950284 A3 20010412; AU 3147699 A 19991018; EP 1066318 A1 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2006-05-17 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20051028

2005-10-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-10-26 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WIRTH, THOMAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20050627

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: WIRTH, THOMAS

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RUMP, ANDREAS

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HESS, JOCHEN

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AIGNER, THOMAS

2003-01-08 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WIRTH, THOMAS

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RUMP, ANDREAS

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HESS, JOCHEN

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AIGNER, THOMAS

2003-01-02 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WIRTH, THOMAS

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: ROSENTHAL, ANDRE

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: RUMP, ANDREAS

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: HESS, JOCHEN

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: AIGNER, THOMAS

2001-04-18 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIN1

- Inventor name: WIRTH, THOMAS

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001002

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FR GB IT LI NL SE