Global patent index - EP 1066325 A1

EP 1066325 A1 2001-01-10 - G-PROTEIN FUSION RECEPTORS AND CHIMERIC GABA B? RECEPTORS

Title (en)

G-PROTEIN FUSION RECEPTORS AND CHIMERIC GABA B? RECEPTORS

Title (de)

G-PROTEIN-GEKOPPELTE REZEPTOREN UND CHIMÄREN GABAB REZEPTOREN

Title (fr)

RECEPTEURS D'HYBRIDATION DE PROTEINE G ET RECEPTEURS GABA B? CHIMERES

Publication

EP 1066325 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99915243 A

Priority

  • US 9907333 W
  • US 8067198 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951641A1] The present invention features G-protein fusion receptors and chimeric GABAB receptors (GABABRs), nucleic acid encoding such receptors, and the use of such receptors and nucleic acid. G-protein fusion receptors comprise at least one domain from a CaR, a mGluR, and/or a GABAB receptor fused directly or through a linker to a guanine nucleotide-binding protein (G-protein). Chimeric GABABRs comprise at least one of a GABABR extracellular domain, a GABABR transmembrane domain, or a GABABR intracellular domain and one or more domains from a mGluR subtype 8 (mGluR8) and/or a CaR.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C07K 14/705; A61K 38/17; C12N 15/12; C12N 15/62

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

C12N 15/00 (2006.01); A61K 38/00 (2006.01); C07K 14/47 (2006.01); C07K 14/705 (2006.01); C12N 1/15 (2006.01); C12N 1/19 (2006.01); C12N 1/21 (2006.01); C12N 5/10 (2006.01); C12N 15/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

C07K 14/4722 (2013.01); C07K 14/705 (2013.01); C07K 14/70571 (2013.01); A61K 38/00 (2013.01); C07K 2319/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9951641A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951641 A1 19991014; AU 3380199 A 19991025; AU 768422 B2 20031211; CA 2325334 A1 19991014; EP 1066325 A1 20010110; IL 138747 D0 20011031; JP 2002510480 A 20020409

INPADOC legal status

2010-04-21 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20091103

2007-12-12 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: ASTRAZENECA AB

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2007-06-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20070521

2006-02-22 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NPS PHARMACEUTICALS, INC.

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001031

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE