Global Patent Index - EP 1066415 A4

EP 1066415 A4 2001-05-09 - TWO PHASE TITANIUM ALUMINIDE ALLOY

Title (en)

TWO PHASE TITANIUM ALUMINIDE ALLOY

Title (de)

TITANALUMINIDLEGIERUNG MIT ZWEI PHASEN

Title (fr)

ALLIAGE D'ALUMINURE DE TITANE A DEUX PHASES

Publication

EP 1066415 A4 (EN)

Application

EP 99935269 A

Priority

  • US 9902212 W
  • US 1748398 A
  • US 17410398 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9951787A1] A two phase titanium aluminide alloy having a lamellar microstructure with little intercolony structures. The alloy can include fine particles such as boride particles at colony boundaries and/or grain boundary equiaxed structures. The alloy can include alloying additions such as </= 10 at % W, Nb and/or Mo. The alloy can be free of Cr, V, Mn, Cu and/or Ni and can include, in atomic %, 45 to 55 % Ti, 40 to 50 % Al, 1 to 5 % Nb, 0.3 to 2 % W, up to 1 % Mo and 0.1 to 0.3 % B. In weight %, the alloy can include 57 to 60 % Ti, 30 to 32 % Al, 4 to 9 % Nb, up to 2 % Mo, 2 to 8 % W and 0.02 to 0.08 % B.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

C22C 14/00; C22C 32/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/23 (2006.01); C22C 1/04 (2006.01); C22C 14/00 (2006.01); C22C 29/00 (2006.01); C22C 32/00 (2006.01); C22F 1/18 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

B22F 3/23 (2013.01); C22C 1/0458 (2013.01); C22C 1/0491 (2013.01); C22C 14/00 (2013.01); C22C 29/005 (2013.01); C22C 32/00 (2013.01); C22F 1/183 (2013.01); B22F 2998/10 (2013.01)

Combination set (CPC)

  1. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 3/1208 + B22F 3/20 + B22F 3/23
  2. B22F 2998/10 + B22F 3/1208 + B22F 3/1035 + B22F 3/23

Citation (search report)

  • [A] US 5281285 A 19940125 - MARQUARDT BRIAN J [US]
  • [A] JIN, Z. (LOS ALAMOS NATIONAL LABORATORY) ET AL: "Texture evolution during alpha -forging of gamma -TiAl alloys.", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A (DEC. 1997) 239-240, 729-735, NUMERICAL DATA, GRAPHS, 13 REF.. SWITZERLAND CONFERENCE: 4TH CONFERENCE ON HIGH TEMPERATURE INTERMETALLICS, SAN DIEGO, CALIFORNIA, USA, 27 APR.-1 MAY 1997 ISSN: 0921-5093, XP002162678
  • [A] LARSON, D.J. (OAK RIDGE NATIONAL LABORATORY) ET AL: "Precipitation and segregation in alpha 2+ gamma titanium aluminides.", MATERIALS SCIENCE AND ENGINEERING A (15 JULY 1998) 250, (1), 65-71, PHOTOMICROGRAPHS, NUMERICAL DATA, GRAPHS, 16 REF.. SWITZERLAND CONFERENCE: 44TH INTERNATIONAL FIELD EMISSION SYMPOSIUM, TSUKUBA, JAPAN, 7-11 JULY 1997 ISSN: 0921-5093, XP002162679
  • [A] SHIDA, Y. (SUMITOMO METAL INDUSTRIES) ET AL: "Role of tungsten, molybdenum, niobium and silicon on oxidation of TiAl in air at high temperatures.", MATER. TRANS., JIM (SEPT. 1994) 35, (9), 623-631, GRAPHS, PHOTOMICROGRAPHS.$R26 REF ISSN: 0916-1821, XP002162680
  • [PA] MCQUAY, P. (HOWMET): "Gamma titanium aluminides.", FOUNDRY MANAGEMENT AND TECHNOLOGY (SEPT. 1998) 126, (9), 58, 60-62, 64, 66-67, GRAPHS ISSN: 0360-8999, XP002162681
  • See also references of WO 9951787A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9951787 A1 19991014; WO 9951787 A9 20000622; AT 221137 T 20020815; AU 5078399 A 19991025; AU 751819 B2 20020829; BR 9908529 A 20001205; CA 2319505 A1 19991014; CA 2319505 C 20091006; CN 1100153 C 20030129; CN 1292038 A 20010418; DE 69902245 D1 20020829; DE 69902245 T2 20030327; EP 1066415 A1 20010110; EP 1066415 A4 20010509; EP 1066415 B1 20020724; ID 26231 A 20001207; JP 2002510750 A 20020409; JP 4664500 B2 20110406; NO 20003891 A 20001002; NO 20003891 D0 20000728; NO 333617 B1 20130722

INPADOC legal status


2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150901

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-11-30 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-28 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-10-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 221137 T

- Effective date: 20150202

2015-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69902245

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140218

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140212

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140219

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PHILIP MORRIS USA INC., RICHMOND, US

- Document: DE 69902245

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-04-24 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS S.A., CH

- Free text: FORMER OWNER: PHILIP MORRIS USA INC., RICHMOND, VA., US

- Document: DE 69902245

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902245

- Representative's name: ABITZ & PARTNER, DE

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-04-24 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Document: DE 69902245

- Representative's name: ABITZ & PARTNER PATENTANWAELTE MBB, DE

- Effective date: 20140320

2014-03-15 [REG AT PC] CHANGE OF THE OWNER

- Owner name: PHILIP MORRIS USA INC., US

- Document: AT 221137 T

- Effective date: 20140121

2014-02-19 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Free text: REGISTERED BETWEEN 20140123 AND 20140129

2007-09-07 [REG HK WD] APPLICATIONS WITHDRAWN, DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN, OR REFUSED AFTER PUBLICATION IN HONG KONG

- Document: HK 1034293

2005-08-17 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

2005-05-25 [REG GB 728Y] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION ALLOWED (SECT. 28/1977)

2004-09-22 [REG GB 728V] APPLICATION FOR RESTORATION FILED (SECT. 28/1977)

2004-09-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20040202

2004-02-02 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040202

2003-12-31 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-07-16 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030425

2003-02-28 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030228

2003-02-14 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

2003-02-03 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030203

2003-02-02 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030202

2003-02-02 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030202

2003-01-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-01-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030130

2003-01-06 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-12-30 [LTIE] LT: INVALIDATION OF EUROPEAN PATENT OR PATENT EXTENSION

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-10-25 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021025

2002-10-24 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-10-24 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021024

2002-08-29 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69902245 20020829

2002-08-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-07-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-07-24 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2002-07-24 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000831;LT PAYMENT 20000831;LV PAYMENT 20000831;MK PAYMENT 20000831;RO PAYMENT 20000831;SI PAYMENT 20000831

2002-07-24 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-07-24 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020724

2002-07-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 221137 T 20020815

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: CHRYSALIS TECHNOLOGIES, INCORPORATED

2001-11-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010924

2001-05-09 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20010326

2001-05-09 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A4

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-05-02 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Free text: 7C 22C 14/00 A, 7C 22C 32/00 B

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000831

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL PAYMENT 20000831;LT PAYMENT 20000831;LV PAYMENT 20000831;MK PAYMENT 20000831;RO PAYMENT 20000831;SI PAYMENT 20000831