Global Patent Index - EP 1066420 A3

EP 1066420 A3 2002-09-11 - MACHINE FOR TREATING THE SURFACE OF AT LEAST ONE TEXTILE WEB OF ENDLESS FABRIC, ESPECIALLY FOR NAPPING AND/OR EMERIZING OR THE LIKE

Title (en)

MACHINE FOR TREATING THE SURFACE OF AT LEAST ONE TEXTILE WEB OF ENDLESS FABRIC, ESPECIALLY FOR NAPPING AND/OR EMERIZING OR THE LIKE

Title (de)

MASCHINE ZUR OBERFLÄCHENBEARBEITUNG MINDESTENS EINER TEXTILEN WARENBAHN, INSBESONDERE ZUM RAUHEN UND/ODER SCHMIRGELN ODER DERGLEICHEN

Title (fr)

MACHINE POUR LE TRAVAIL EN SURFACE D'AU MOINS UNE BANDE DE MATERIAU TEXTILE, EN PARTICULIER POUR LE LAINAGE ET/OU L'EMERISAGE OU OPERATION ANALOGUE

Publication

EP 1066420 A3 (DE)

Application

EP 99939905 A

Priority

  • DE 9900610 W
  • DE 19808804 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19808804A1] The apparatus to treat the surface of textile piecegoods, to roughen and/or abrade the fabric surface, has a drum (3) with planetary and powered roughening rollers, mounted to a tubular carrier body (9) fixed at the machine frame (10) for powered rotation. The carrier body (9) is fixed to the machine frame (10) by a release mounting (11). The carrier body (9) has mounting points (14) for at least one stripping roller within the drum (3). The dust funnel (8) is fitted to the carrier body (9), with openings (91) for the major portion of the dust funnel (8) within the drum (3). The carrier body (9) is part of a suction channel, at least at the section emerging from the drum (3). At least two bearing seats are on the carrier body (9) with shaped rosettes (31), where at least one has at least one hub (312) for the drum (3) drive and/or a hub (314) for the drive of at least one stripper roller at the drum (3) circumference or within the drum (3). The hubs (312, 314) have external tooth (315) profiles to transmit the drives. The interior of the carrier body (9) has at least one feed and/or extraction channel.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

D06C 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

D06C 11/00 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

ES FR GB IT PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19808804 A1 19990909; DE 19808804 C2 20010322; CN 1161510 C 20040811; CN 1294645 A 20010509; EP 1066420 A2 20010110; EP 1066420 A3 20020911; EP 1066420 B1 20020612; ES 2154256 T1 20010401; ES 2154256 T3 20030101; HK 1038597 A1 20050218; KR 100385749 B1 20030528; PT 1066420 E 20021031; TR 200002539 T2 20010221; US 6584657 B1 20030701; WO 9954538 A2 19991028; WO 9954538 A3 20001123

INPADOC legal status


2017-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20170217

- Year of fee payment: 19

2010-07-30 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090228

2010-04-29 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20090228

2008-10-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080827

2008-10-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20060221

- Year of fee payment: 8

2008-09-09 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20080827

2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070227

2008-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-24 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20070227

2007-02-21 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20070221

- Year of fee payment: 9

2006-02-15 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060215

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-06-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030313

2003-01-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154256 T3

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-10-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020812

2002-10-02 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020906

2002-09-11 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A3

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT PT

2002-06-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT PT

2002-06-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-06-12 [XX] MISCELLANEOUS:

- Free text: DERZEIT SIND DIE WIPO-PUBLIKATIONSDATEN A3 NICHT VERFUEGBAR.

2001-10-31 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN APPLICATION

- Owner name: XETMA GEMATEX GMBH

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010719

2001-04-01 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2154256 T1

2001-03-16 [EL] FR: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED

2001-02-28 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000729

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): ES FR GB IT PT