Global patent index - EP 1066437 A1

EP 1066437 A1 2001-01-10 - SPRING-LOADED CATCH FOR A SLIDING DOOR OF A SHEET METAL CUPBOARD

Title (en)

SPRING-LOADED CATCH FOR A SLIDING DOOR OF A SHEET METAL CUPBOARD

Title (de)

SCHNAPPVERSCHLUSS FÜR EINE BLECHSCHRANKSCHIEBETÜR

Title (fr)

LOQUETEAU D'UNE PORTE COULISSANTE D'UNE ARMOIRE EN METAL

Publication

EP 1066437 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911792 A

Priority

  • DE 29805358 U
  • EP 9901670 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6550824B1] Disclosed is a snap lock device for a sliding door of a machine casing, which sliding door is preferably reinforced on at least one side by a sheet metal fold or a hollow rectangular profile, with a handle which is swivelably mounted at the reinforced side of the sliding door and which cooperates with a latch bolt device, and with a retaining device for receiving the latch bolt when the door is closed, this retaining device being arranged on or accommodated in a door frame or in a profile defining an opening in the machine casing. The handle comprises a bar whose ends are supported around a swivel pin extending parallel to the reinforced side of the door leaf and located behind the door leaf or inside the sheet metal fold or hollow profile, the ends of the bar being received in a bar holder, and at least one of the two bar holders is coupled with a hook which is mounted so as to be swivelable coaxially to the swivel pin and has free travel and forms the lock latch.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 7/00; E05B 47/06; E05B 65/08; E05C 3/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05C 3/16 (2006.01); E05B 7/00 (2006.01); E05B 47/06 (2006.01); E05B 65/08 (2006.01); E05C 3/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 65/0852 (2013.01); E05C 3/124 (2013.01); Y10T 292/081 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0831 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0857 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0932 (2015.04); Y10T 292/0949 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1059 (2015.04); Y10T 292/108 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949158A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 29805358 U1 19990729; DE 19980501 D2 20010322; EP 1066437 A1 20010110; EP 1066437 B1 20011121; JP 2002507680 A 20020312; US 6550824 B1 20030422; WO 9949158 A1 19990930; WO 9949158 B1 19991104

INPADOC legal status

2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160407

- Year of fee payment: 18

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090313

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090313

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080221

- Year of fee payment: 10

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2002-11-13 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-03-12 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20020312

- Year of fee payment: 4

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900686

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-02-13 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020122

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-11-21 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2001-04-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010221

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000823

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB