Global Patent Index - EP 1066438 B1

EP 1066438 B1 2001-12-19 - DOOR LOCK WITH ROLLER CATCH, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (en)

DOOR LOCK WITH ROLLER CATCH, ESPECIALLY FOR MOTOR VEHICLES

Title (de)

TÜRSCHLOSS MIT EINER DREHFALLE, INSBESONDERE FÜR FAHRZEUGE

Title (fr)

SERRURE DE PORTE DOTEE D'UN LOQUET ROTATIF ET DESTINEE NOTAMMENT A DES VEHICULES

Publication

EP 1066438 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915613 A

Priority

  • DE 19812606 A
  • EP 9901686 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812606A1] The invention relates to a door lock provided with a roller catch (11). When the door is closed an immobile locking part (10) moves into said roller catch (11), causing it to pivot from an open position into a preliminary or main latching position, the roller catch (11) being held by a latch. For greater user comfort and a more compact door lock the invention provides for the same drive motor (30) to be used as locking aid and as opening aid. A transmission element (35) which can be moved into two different positions is introduced into the gear assembly (31, 37). The drive energy generated by the drive motor (30) is transmitted in one position to the roller catch and in the other position to a second output track leading to the locking latch (20).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05B 17/00; E05B 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05B 47/00 (2006.01); E05B 81/14 (2014.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05B 81/14 (2013.01); Y10S 292/23 (2013.01); Y10T 292/1047 (2015.04); Y10T 292/1082 (2015.04)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812606 A1 19990930; AU 3412699 A 19991018; AU 740850 B2 20011115; BR 9909020 A 20001205; CN 1294651 A 20010509; EP 1066438 A1 20010110; EP 1066438 B1 20011219; ES 2165732 T3 20020316; JP 2002507681 A 20020312; KR 20010042142 A 20010525; PT 1066438 E 20020628; US 6568720 B1 20030527; WO 9949159 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2017-07-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170328

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-07-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140316

2015-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140315

2015-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140315

2015-01-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140331

2014-12-31 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140915

2014-12-26 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20141128

2014-11-28 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140316

2014-11-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20140315

2014-11-04 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2014-10-22 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-09-23 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20140915

2013-08-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-08-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20130419

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-06-28 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130228

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20130306

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20130326

- Year of fee payment: 15

2012-06-29 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20120322

- Year of fee payment: 14

2002-12-11 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-28 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020318

2002-05-31 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-04-17 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020322

2002-03-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2165732 T3

2002-01-31 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900596 20020131

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-12-19 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000721

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE