Global Patent Index - EP 1066441 A1

EP 1066441 A1 2001-01-10 - MOTOR VEHICLE HINGE WITH A BRAKING AND HOLDING FUNCTION

Title (en)

MOTOR VEHICLE HINGE WITH A BRAKING AND HOLDING FUNCTION

Title (de)

KRAFTWAGENSCHARNIER MIT BREMS- UND HALTEFUNKTION

Title (fr)

CHARNIERE POUR AUTOMOBILES POURVUE D'UNE FONCTION DE FREINAGE ET DE RETENUE

Publication

EP 1066441 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99907298 A

Priority

  • DE 9900254 W
  • DE 19813520 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6490759B1] The invention relates to motor vehicle door hinges with a braking and holding function, consisting of a first hinge half (1) which can be fixed to a door assembly part, door or door post, a second hinge half (2) which can be fixed to the other door assembly part and a hinge pin (3) which consists of a solid material and which connects the two hinge halves (1,2) in such a way that they pivot. The hinge pin (3) is connected to the gudgeon (5) of one hinge half (2) in such a way that it is rotationally fixed and is mounted in the gudgeon (4) of the other hinge half (1) with a running fit. The curvature (7) of the cross-section of said hinge pin also deviates from that of a perfect circle at least over a section (6) of the longitudinal part of the hinge pin which is associated with the particular gudgeon (4), this corresponding with a complementary configuration of the gudgeon bore of the gudgeon of the hinge half in which the hinge pin is mounted with its running fit. In order to ensure that the braking and holding force remains constant with a constant door-opening angle over the entire lifetime of the hinge, the gudgeon bore of the gudgeon (4) in which the hinge pin is mounted with a running fit is sealed steam-tight at both ends, as far as the hinge pin.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

E05D 11/08; E05D 11/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/12 (2006.01); E05D 11/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

E05D 5/121 (2013.01); E05D 11/084 (2013.01); E05Y 2900/531 (2013.01); Y10T 16/5373 (2013.01); Y10T 16/54038 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949164A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6490759 B1 20021210; AU 2711999 A 19991018; BR 9909066 A 20020115; CN 1295643 A 20010516; CZ 20003540 A3 20011212; DE 19980502 D2 20010510; EP 1066441 A1 20010110; EP 1066441 B1 20010516; ES 2158733 T3 20010901; JP 2002507684 A 20020312; MX PA00009371 A 20020621; WO 9949164 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160120

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-10-06 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: EDSCHA ENGINEERING GMBH, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900094

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2011-10-06 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 59900094

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: BONNEKAMP & SPARING, DE

- Effective date: 20110812

2005-04-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Ref Legal Event Code: FD2A

- Effective date: 20040129

2004-10-29 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

2004-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040930

2004-01-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040129

2003-01-24 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030124

- Year of fee payment: 5

2003-01-10 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20030110

- Year of fee payment: 5

2002-05-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2001-11-14 [GBV] GB: EP PATENT (UK) TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID IN ACCORDANCE WITH GB SECTION 77(7)/1977

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBV

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-11-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLV1

2001-10-19 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2001-09-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2158733

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2001-08-16 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-08-16 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010816

2001-06-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900094

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2001-06-21

2001-05-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE

2001-05-16 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-05-16 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-03-07 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010123

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001004

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT NL PT SE