Global Patent Index - EP 1066456 A1

EP 1066456 A1 2001-01-10 - AIR-COOLED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A CRANKSHAFT WHICH ROTATES ABOUT A VERTICAL AXIS, ESPECIALLY A SINGLE CYLINDER DIESEL MOTOR

Title (en)

AIR-COOLED INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A CRANKSHAFT WHICH ROTATES ABOUT A VERTICAL AXIS, ESPECIALLY A SINGLE CYLINDER DIESEL MOTOR

Title (de)

LUFTGEKÜHLTER VERBRENNUNGSMOTOR MIT UM EINE VERTIKALE ACHSE ROTIERENDER KURBELWELLE, INSBESONDERE EINZYLINDER-DIESELMOTOR

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE REFROIDI PAR AIR ET COMPRENANT UN VILEBREQUIN TOURNANT AUTOUR D'UN AXE VERTICAL, NOTAMMENT MOTEUR DIESEL A UN SEUL CYLINDRE

Publication

EP 1066456 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99917899 A

Priority

  • DE 19813624 A
  • EP 9902126 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813624A1] The invention relates to an air-cooled internal combustion engine with a crankshaft which rotates about a vertical axis, especially a single cylinder diesel motor. Said internal combustion engine has an encapsulation which surrounds the cooling air channels. The flywheel is positioned at the top end of the crankshaft (1), said flywheel being combined with a radial blower (3). An air distribution housing (4) which is joined to the top front wall (2) of the crankcase forms the pressure chamber (5) of the radial blower (3). At least two sub-streams of cooling air branch off from said pressure chamber (5), a first sub-stream (L1) being guided through a housing encapsulation (21) which surrounds the cylinder (10) and the cylinder head (11) and a second sub-stream (L2) being guided in a lining (22) on the outside of the side wall (12) of the crankcase and the oil pan (13) facing the cylinder. Both sub-streams of cooling air (L1, L2) are collected on the downstream side and exit through a common air-extractor shaft.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02B 75/16; F01P 5/06; F02B 75/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02B 67/00 (2006.01); F01P 5/06 (2006.01); F02B 75/00 (2006.01); F02B 75/16 (2006.01); F02B 3/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02B 75/16 (2013.01); F01P 5/06 (2013.01); F02B 75/007 (2013.01); F02B 3/06 (2013.01); F05C 2201/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9950542A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813624 A1 19990930; DE 19813624 B4 20041111; EP 1066456 A1 20010110; EP 1066456 B1 20021106; JP 2002510012 A 20020402; JP 3556905 B2 20040825; US 6405690 B1 20020618; WO 9950542 A1 19991007

INPADOC legal status


2016-07-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160530

- Year of fee payment: 18

2011-03-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090329

2010-04-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090329

2009-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20090329

2008-09-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080329

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-05-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20080318

- Year of fee payment: 10

2003-10-29 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030807

2002-12-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903320

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-12-12

2002-11-27 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20021106

2002-11-06 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT

2002-11-06 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-05-08 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20020326

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000919

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE GB IT