Global Patent Index - EP 1066459 A1

EP 1066459 A1 2001-01-10 - INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A FLUID COOLING SYSTEM

Title (en)

INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE WITH A FLUID COOLING SYSTEM

Title (de)

BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE MIT FLUIDKÜHLSYSTEM

Title (fr)

MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE DOTE D'UN SYSTEME DE REFROIDISSEMENT PAR FLUIDE

Publication

EP 1066459 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99906243 A

Priority

  • DE 19812831 A
  • EP 9901045 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812831A1] The invention relates to an internal combustion engine with at least one cylinder bank of cylinders (12) arranged in a row in at least one cylinder block, and at least one fluid cooling system allocated to a particular cylinder bank. Said fluid cooling system has at least one fluid channel (10) configured in a cylinder block. This fluid channel (10) conducts fluid through the cylinder block in order to provide a water jacket adjacent to the cylinders (12) for cooling the same. Said fluid channel (10) is delimited by a floor (16) on the crankcase side in a cylinder block situated between a cylinder head and the crankcase. This floor (16) of the fluid channel (10) is configured in the form of a curved plane.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02F 7/00; F02F 1/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F01P 3/02 (2006.01); F02F 1/14 (2006.01); F02F 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02F 7/007 (2013.01); F02F 1/14 (2013.01); F02F 2001/104 (2013.01); F02F 2001/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949201A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812831 A1 19990930; CN 1109191 C 20030521; CN 1294656 A 20010509; EP 1066459 A1 20010110; EP 1066459 B1 20020515; EP 1066459 B2 20050928; ES 2175947 T3 20021116; ES 2175947 T5 20060301; JP 2002507692 A 20020312; JP 4242068 B2 20090318; US 6397792 B1 20020604; WO 9949201 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2017-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160901

2017-01-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160217

2017-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160229

2016-12-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160217

2016-11-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20161028

2016-10-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20160217

2016-09-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59901459

2015-05-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-05-29 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20150326

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20150228

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20150227

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-27 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 17

2011-12-08 [REG DE R084] DECLARATION OF WILLINGNESS TO LICENCE

- Document: DE 59901459

- Effective date: 20111008

2006-05-19 [ET3] FR: TRANSLATION FILED ** DECISION CONCERNING OPPOSITION

2006-03-01 [REG ES DC2A] PATENT MODIFIED

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T5

2005-11-23 [GBTA] GB: TRANSLATION OF AMENDED EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(B)/1977)

2005-09-28 [27A] MAINTAINED AS AMENDED

- Effective date: 20050928

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B2

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2003-04-09 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: PEUGEOT CITROEN AUTOMOBILES SA

- Effective date: 20030213

2002-11-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2175947 T3

2002-08-15 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020815

2002-08-14 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020720

2002-06-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59901459 20020620

2002-05-15 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE

2002-05-15 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-09-05 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010726

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001024

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT SE