Global Patent Index - EP 1066460 A2

EP 1066460 A2 2001-01-10 - PRESSURE VALVE

Title (en)

PRESSURE VALVE

Title (de)

DRUCKVENTIL

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE DE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1066460 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99942739 A

Priority

  • DE 9901921 W
  • DE 29811791 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6497247B1] A pressure valve having a valve body inserted into a bore of a valve housing. The valve body on one end that has plunged into the valve housing has a valve seat face in contact with a movable valve member which can be seated by a restoring force and which is adjoined by a through conduit. The movable valve member penetrates the valve body, for the sake of simpler axial securing of the valve body in the valve housing and also for easier dismantling, the valve body is secured axially in the valve housing via a detent connection.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/46

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/46 (2006.01); F16K 15/04 (2006.01); F16K 27/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 59/462 (2013.01); F16K 27/0209 (2013.01); Y10T 137/778 (2015.04)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0001937A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29811791 U1 19991118; EP 1066460 A2 20010110; JP 2002519583 A 20020702; US 6497247 B1 20021224; WO 0001937 A2 20000113; WO 0001937 A3 20001116

INPADOC legal status


2005-02-09 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040805

2004-04-21 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- IPC: 7F 02M 59/46 A

2003-05-21 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030403

2001-07-18 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010516

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT