Global Patent Index - EP 1066462 A1

EP 1066462 A1 2001-01-10 - AIR FILTER FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (en)

AIR FILTER FOR AN INTERNAL COMBUSTION ENGINE

Title (de)

LUFTFILTER FÜR EINE BRENNKRAFTMASCHINE

Title (fr)

FILTRE A AIR DESTINE A UN MOTEUR A COMBUSTION INTERNE

Publication

EP 1066462 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99913178 A

Priority

  • DE 19812566 A
  • EP 9901116 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812566A1] The air filter housing (10) is provided with a filter insert (11) and a clean air outlet (15) and two untreated air inlets (16,18). The first inlet is provided with a sieve or a flap opened and closed depending on the untreated air temperature. The second untreated air inlet (18) is provided with a weight or spring loaded flap (19). An adjusting element is provided operated electrically or mechanically.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 35/08; F02M 31/07

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 31/04 (2006.01); F02M 35/08 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 35/08 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949205A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812566 A1 19990923; EP 1066462 A1 20010110; EP 1066462 B1 20020116; JP 2002507693 A 20020312; US 6423108 B1 20020723; WO 9949205 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2008-04-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070228

2008-01-31 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070901

2008-01-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2007-11-30 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20071030

2007-10-23 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2007-02-21 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070221

2006-02-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060216

- Year of fee payment: 8

2006-02-14 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060214

- Year of fee payment: 8

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

2002-06-21 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59900633 20020221

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE

2001-07-04 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010525

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000810

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR SE