Global Patent Index - EP 1066463 A2

EP 1066463 A2 2001-01-10 - FUEL DELIVERY MODULE WITH AN INITIAL FILLING VALVE

Title (en)

FUEL DELIVERY MODULE WITH AN INITIAL FILLING VALVE

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFF-FÖRDERMODUL MIT ERSTBEFÜLLVENTIL

Title (fr)

MODULE D'ACHEMINEMENT DE CARBURANT COMPORTANT UNE SOUPAPE DE REMPLISSAGE INITIAL

Publication

EP 1066463 A2 (DE)

Application

EP 99922058 A

Priority

  • DE 9900832 W
  • DE 19813172 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813172A1] The present invention relates to a device for supplying fuel from a tank to an internal combustion engine in a motor vehicle. The device comprises a fuel delivery unit which is connected on the aspiration side to an aspiration housing communicating with the tank, while said unit is connected on the discharge side to the internal combustion engine. The device also includes a back-flow duct for supplying the excess fuel to the aspiration housing. The aspiration housing comprises at its bottom a closing member which can be displaced between a first open position and a second closed position. According to this invention, the closing member is provided with an actuation unit preferably in the form of a float for maintaining said closing member in the first open position when the fuel level in the tank is low or equal to zero. When the tank contains an amount of fuel which is at least sufficient for the fuel delivery unit to supply enough fuel to the internal combustion engine, the above-mentioned actuation unit maintains the closure member in the second closed position.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 37/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/00 (2006.01); F02M 37/04 (2006.01); F02M 37/10 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 37/106 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949207A3

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813172 A1 19990930; BR 9909036 A 20001205; EP 1066463 A2 20010110; EP 1066463 B1 20030604; JP 2002507694 A 20020312; US 6450151 B1 20020917; WO 9949207 A2 19990930; WO 9949207 A3 20000413

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-23 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050323

2005-01-07 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2004-11-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041130

2004-10-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041001

2004-05-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040305

2004-03-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-07-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59905843 P 20030710

2003-06-04 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001025

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT