Global Patent Index - EP 1066465 A1

EP 1066465 A1 2001-01-10 - FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR HIGH-PRESSURE FUEL INJECTION

Title (en)

FUEL INJECTION VALVE FOR HIGH-PRESSURE FUEL INJECTION

Title (de)

KRAFTSTOFF-EINSPRITZVENTIL FÜR EINE HOCHDRUCKEINSPRITZUNG

Title (fr)

SOUPAPE D'INJECTION DE CARBURANT POUR INJECTION SOUS HAUTE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1066465 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99966842 A

Priority

  • DE 9903913 W
  • DE 19859484 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19859484A1] The invention relates to a fuel injection valve for high-pressure fuel injection from a central high-pressure line (6) to the combustion chambers of an internal combustion engine. The inventive valve (1) comprises a valve seat (2), a valve ball (3) and a guide element (4) for the valve ball (3). The guide element (4) presses the valve ball (3) against the valve seat (2) in order to close the injection control valve. In an open position, the guide element exposes the valve ball (3) to the effects of a prestressing spring (5). The valve ball (3) is raised above the seat (2) of the valve by means of a high pressure jet that is supplied by a control chamber (7)which cooperates with a second high-pressure line (6) via a discharging outlet port (8) when open. A diffuser (9) is arranged between the valve seat (2) and the outlet port (8). The outlet port (8), diffuser (9) and valve seat (2) form an approximately funnel shape with steep walls, whereby the conical angle thereof is a right to sharp angle.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 47/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/00 (2006.01); F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/46 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 63/0036 (2013.01); F02M 63/0071 (2013.01); F02M 63/0077 (2013.01); F02M 2547/003 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0037793A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19859484 A1 20000706; EP 1066465 A1 20010110; EP 1066465 B1 20040317; JP 2002533607 A 20021008; US 6378502 B1 20020430; WO 0037793 A1 20000629

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170224

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20161221

- Year of fee payment: 18

2017-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20161220

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-12-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-18 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-10-30 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141208

2015-08-26 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20141208

2014-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20131217

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-03-09 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20041220

2004-11-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-20 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-28 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040706

2004-04-22 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59908890 P 20040422

2004-04-21 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-03-17 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB IT

2004-03-17 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-03-07 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001229

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE