Global Patent Index - EP 1066466 A1

EP 1066466 A1 2001-01-10 - HIGH-PRESSURE PISTON CYLINDER UNIT

Title (en)

HIGH-PRESSURE PISTON CYLINDER UNIT

Title (de)

HOCHDRUCK-KOLBENZYLINDEREINHEIT

Title (fr)

UNITE CYLINDRE-PISTON HAUTE PRESSION

Publication

EP 1066466 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99915701 A

Priority

  • DE 19813454 A
  • DE 19820264 A
  • EP 9902010 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949209A1] The invention relates to a high-pressure piston cylinder unit, especially an injection pump or an injection valve for an internal combustion engine, and to a method for producing one such high-pressure piston cylinder unit. The high-pressure piston cylinder unit comprises a piston (5) which is guided inside a cylinder bore (3) and which is coupled to an actuating element. Said piston is subjected to a high pressure differential. According to the invention, fine grooves (10) which run very close to one another are configured in at least one part of the guiding surface of the piston (5). Said grooves ensure hydraulic pressure compensation on the periphery of the guiding surface, thus reducing wear, and prevent leakage in a longitudinal guiding direction.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F02M 59/44; F02M 61/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/02 (2006.01); F02M 59/44 (2006.01); F02M 61/12 (2006.01); F02M 61/16 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F02M 47/027 (2013.01); F02M 59/44 (2013.01); F02M 59/442 (2013.01); F02M 61/12 (2013.01); F02M 61/16 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949209A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949209 A1 19990930; AT 226279 T 20021115; EP 1066466 A1 20010110; EP 1066466 B1 20021016; US 6477940 B1 20021112

INPADOC legal status


2016-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160324

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160322

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-05-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160323

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160321

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-03-21 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 18

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PCAR

- Free Format Text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2003-10-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20030717

2003-05-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2003-02-19 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20030128

2002-11-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59903092

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-21

2002-10-31 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

- Ref Legal Event Code: EP

2002-10-31 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: NV

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2002-10-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI

2002-10-16 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

- Free Format Text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-10-16 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 226279

- Country of Ref Document: AT

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-11-15

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: MTU FRIEDRICHSHAFEN GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-12-05 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: L'ORANGE GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-08-22 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010711

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000907

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE FR GB IT LI