Global Patent Index - EP 1066472 A1

EP 1066472 A1 2001-01-10 - LIQUID RING PUMP

Title (en)

LIQUID RING PUMP

Title (de)

FLÜSSIGKEITSRINGPUMPE

Title (fr)

POMPE A ANNEAU DE LIQUIDE

Publication

EP 1066472 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99920544 A

Priority

  • DE 9900679 W
  • DE 29805345 U

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949221A1] The invention relates to a liquid ring pump, comprising a runner which rotates in a working-area housing, a control disk (2) which has at least one suction opening and at least one pressure opening (7) and which closes off one side of the working-area housing, at least one removable valve plate (1) which covers at least some of the pressure openings (7), a limiting stop (15) of the valve plate (1), a pump cover (14) which covers the control disk (2) and has at least one intake chamber and at least one pressure chamber (6) and at least one guide element (4) which fixes the valve plate (1) on the pump cover (14) and/or on the control disk (2). The pump cover (14) also has elements for stopping and limiting (15) the valve plate (1). At least one guide element (4) protrudes through at least one of the openings of the valve plate (1).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F04C 29/08

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F04C 19/00 (2006.01); F04C 29/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F04C 29/128 (2013.01); F04C 19/007 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949221A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

IT

EPO simple patent family

DE 29805345 U1 19980806; EP 1066472 A1 20010110; EP 1066472 B1 20020605; WO 9949221 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2005-03-11 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050311

2003-05-28 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030306

2002-06-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): IT

2001-11-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20011010

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000825

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): IT