Global Patent Index - EP 1066486 A1

EP 1066486 A1 2001-01-10 - METHOD OF INCINERATING WASTE MATERIAL, AND INCINERATOR FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD

Title (en)

METHOD OF INCINERATING WASTE MATERIAL, AND INCINERATOR FOR CARRYING OUT THE METHOD

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM VERBRENNEN VON ABFALL UND VERBRENNUNGSANLAGE DAFÜR

Title (fr)

PROCEDE D'INCINERATION DE DECHETS ET INCINERATEUR POUR LA MISE EN OEUVRE DUDIT PROCEDE

Publication

EP 1066486 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 98914835 A

Priority

DK 9800112 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949265A1] In a method of incinerating waste material in a first combustion zone (2, 3), in which uncombusted or partly combusted material from said first zone (2, 3) is subjected to additional incineration in a second combustion zone (6), the main novel feature is the use of a fluidized-bed furnace (6), preferably with circulating sand and a separator (7) to remove ashes, slag and/or other incombustible matter. With this arrangement, increased adaptability of the second combustion zone to variations in the amount per unit time of material received from the first combustion zone is achieved.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

F23G 5/16; F23G 5/30

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/16 (2006.01); F23G 5/20 (2006.01); F23G 5/30 (2006.01); F23G 7/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

F23G 5/16 (2013.01); F23G 5/20 (2013.01); F23G 5/30 (2013.01); F23G 7/001 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949265A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949265 A1 19990930; AT 219829 T 20020715; AU 6918098 A 19991018; DE 69806273 D1 20020801; DE 69806273 T2 20030206; DK 1066486 T3 20021014; EP 1066486 A1 20010110; EP 1066486 B1 20020626

INPADOC legal status


2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20151001

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-01 [REG SE EUG] EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2015-11-30 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150324

2015-10-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150331

2015-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69806273

2014-08-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-05-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140317

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 17

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140325

- Year of fee payment: 17

2004-01-14 [REG IE MM4A] PATENT LAPSED

2003-11-12 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20030323

2003-06-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030327

2003-03-24 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030324

2003-03-23 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030323

2002-12-31 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2002-12-20 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20021220

2002-12-06 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-12-02 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-10-14 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2002-09-26 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020926

2002-08-01 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69806273 20020801

2002-07-24 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

2002-06-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-06-26 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE

2002-06-26 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

2002-06-26 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020626

2002-06-26 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 219829 T 20020715

2002-06-26 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: NIELSEN, JOERGEN, VITUS

2001-10-10 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BABCOCK & WILCOX VOLUND APS

2001-05-09 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010323

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001023

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IE IT LI NL PT SE