Global Patent Index - EP 1066540 A1

EP 1066540 A1 2001-01-10 - LOW SLOPE DISPERSION MANAGED WAVEGUIDE

Title (en)

LOW SLOPE DISPERSION MANAGED WAVEGUIDE

Title (de)

WELLENLEITER MIT VERTEILTER DISPERSION GERINGER STEIGUNG

Title (fr)

GUIDE D'ONDE GERE EN DISPERSION FAIBLE PENTE

Publication

EP 1066540 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99913812 A

Priority

  • US 9903403 W
  • US 7575498 P

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9942869A1] Disclosed is a single mode optical waveguide fiber having alternating segments of positive and negative dispersion and dispersion slope. The relative indexes, the refractive index profiles and the radii of the segments are chosen to provide low total dispersion and dispersion slope. One embodiment consists of a first central major index profile (10) of outer radius r1, surrounded by a first annular segment (12) of outer radius r2, surrounded by second annular segment (14) of outer radius r3. Preferred waveguides in accordance with the invention exhibit a dispersion over the range of 1520 to 1625 nm which at all times have a magnitude which is less than 2, and more preferably less than 1 ps/nm<2>-km. The total dispersion of the waveguide fiber is in the range of about -2.0 to +2.0 ps/nm-km at 1550 nm. The waveguide also features a low polarization mode dispersion.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G02B 6/16

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/02 (2006.01); G02B 6/34 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G02B 6/02233 (2013.01); G02B 6/02247 (2013.01); G02B 6/02261 (2013.01); G02B 6/03644 (2013.01); G02B 6/03666 (2013.01); G02B 6/02285 (2013.01); G02B 6/0281 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9942869 A1 19990826; AU 3180599 A 19990906; AU 750557 B2 20020725; BR 9907943 A 20001024; CA 2318423 A1 19990826; CN 1120379 C 20030903; CN 1288523 A 20010321; EP 1066540 A1 20010110; EP 1066540 A4 20050518; ID 27455 A 20010412; JP 2002504702 A 20020212; JP 4208415 B2 20090114

INPADOC legal status


2008-03-19 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20071002

2007-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-08-10 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20050623

2005-05-18 [A4] SUPPLEMENTARY SEARCH REPORT

- Effective date: 20050406

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000622

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE DK ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE