Global patent index - EP 1066606 A1

EP 1066606 A1 2001-01-10 - AUTOMATIC COIN-OPERATED DEPOSIT LOCKING DEVICE FOR USE IN A SYSTEM OF CUSTOMER TROLLEYS

Title (en)

AUTOMATIC COIN-OPERATED DEPOSIT LOCKING DEVICE FOR USE IN A SYSTEM OF CUSTOMER TROLLEYS

Title (de)

AUTOMATISCHES MIT MÜNZE BETÄTIGTES PFANDSCHLOSS FÜR EIN SYSTEM VON EINKAUFSWAGEN FÜR BENUTZER

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF DE VERROUILLAGE DE CONSIGNE A PIECE AUTOMATIQUE UTILISE DANS UN SYSTEME DE CHARIOTS POUR CLIENTS

Publication

EP 1066606 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99911628 A

Priority

  • DK 9900175 W
  • DK 46798 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9952086A1] Automatic coin-operated deposit locking device to be fitted on a trolley which may form part of a coupled row of such trolleys, more specifically customer trolleys, shopping trolleys and baggage trolleys to be rented to customers against a deposit. The automatic device is designed to release a retained trolley from the row by insertion of a deposit of a certain value, for example a coin, into the automatic device, and to release the deposit inserted when the trolley is returned for re-coupling of the trolley to the row of trolleys, and with a locking opening accepting, retaining and releasing a key belonging to a preceding trolley in a row of trolleys. The automatic coin-operated deposit locking device consists of a combination of a deposit insertion gate (38) for insertion of a deposit of a form predetermined for example in terms of size, a scanning component (34) for the deposit displaceable in the insertion direction mentioned and extending into the gate, a scanning component (36) displaceable parallel to the deposit scanning component for insertion of the key of a preceding trolley, a blocking mechanism operatively movable transversally to both the insertion and exit directions of the deposit insertion gate (38) and the insertion direction of both the deposit scanning component (34) and the key scanning components (36), consisting of a catch (40) turnable around a shaft (44) running transversally to the insertion directions, and having a locking catch arm (56) with outwards open locking recesses (58) facing another deposit scanner (42) formed like a tong (60) with jaws (62) movable in relation to one another which combined constitute an opening facing the deposit insertion gate and constituting part of a side limitation of the latter, and the two arms of the handle of which both face the locking catch arm and are designed to either engage with or disengage from the outwardly open locking recesses (58) of the locking catch (56), in connection with which the movability of the movable parts of the automatic device in relation to each other is spring loaded (68, 74, 78).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

G07F 7/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

G07F 7/0654 (2013.01); G07F 7/0663 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9952086A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE DK ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 9952086 A1 19991014; AU 3024499 A 19991025; DE 69910750 D1 20031002; EP 1066606 A1 20010110; EP 1066606 B1 20030827

INPADOC legal status

2004-11-17 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20040326

2004-09-10 [EN] FR: TRANSLATION NOT FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: EN

2004-08-18 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20040528

2004-03-26 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040326

2003-12-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031128

2003-11-27 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-10-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69910750

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2003-10-02

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2003-08-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT

2003-08-27 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2003-08-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2003-08-27 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20030827

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20001102

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE DK ES FR GB IT