Global Patent Index - EP 1066661 A1

EP 1066661 A1 2001-01-10 - ELECTRICAL DEVICE

Title (en)

ELECTRICAL DEVICE

Title (de)

ELEKTRISCHE EINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

DISPOSITIF ELECTRIQUE

Publication

EP 1066661 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99924669 A

Priority

  • DE 9900856 W
  • DE 19812635 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19812635A1] The invention relates to a device for contacting at least one electrical conductor. A clamping contact blade can be pressed against the conductor at an acute angle. The conductor can be inserted into a channel of an insulating part, which channel is bent such as to form an acute angle in relation to the conductor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 13/52; H05B 3/06

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 4/2433 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949538A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

EPO simple patent family

DE 19812635 A1 19991007; DE 19812635 C2 20031224; AT 233965 T 20030315; CA 2325717 A1 19990930; CA 2325717 C 20080729; CZ 20003518 A3 20011212; CZ 298190 B6 20070718; DK 1066661 T3 20030630; EP 1066661 A1 20010110; EP 1066661 B1 20030305; PL 195885 B1 20071130; PL 343097 A1 20010730; US 6454593 B1 20020924; WO 9949538 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170330

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-04-29 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-02-29 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-02-29 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150318

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150318

2016-01-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150331

2016-01-01 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20151130

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150318

2015-12-02 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150401

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150318

2015-11-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 233965 T

- Effective date: 20150318

2015-10-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2015-10-26 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

- Effective date: 20150331

2014-08-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140130

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20140311

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP BE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Payment date: 20140217

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-05-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20140327

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20140210

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP DK] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Payment date: 20140321

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-04-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20140205

- Year of fee payment: 16

2007-10-30 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BARTEC GMBH

- Free text: BARTEC GMBH#MAX-EYTH-STRASSE 16#97980 BAD MERGENTHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BARTEC GMBH#MAX-EYTH-STRASSE 16#97980 BAD MERGENTHEIM (DE)

2004-02-25 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031208

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-06-30 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2003-06-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

2003-05-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2003-05-15 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: BARTEC GMBH

- Free text: BARTEC COMPONENTEN UND SYSTEME GMBH#MAX-EYTH-STR. 16#97980 BAD MERGENTHEIM (DE) -TRANSFER TO- BARTEC GMBH#MAX-EYTH-STRASSE 16#97980 BAD MERGENTHEIM (DE)

2003-04-10 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904448 P 20030410

2003-03-14 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2003-03-05 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL

2003-03-05 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-08-28 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: BARTEC COMPONENTEN UND SYSTEME GMBH

2001-02-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010116

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: BARLIAN, REINHOLD

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MICHELBACH, THOMAS

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: SCHMAHL, GISBERT

2001-01-31 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: LOESCH, HANS-MARTIN

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000921

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE DK FR GB IT LI NL