Global patent index - EP 1066662 A1

EP 1066662 A1 2001-01-10 - CONNECTOR

Title (en)

CONNECTOR

Title (de)

VERBINDER

Title (fr)

CONNECTEUR

Publication

EP 1066662 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99905048 A

Priority

  • GB 9900463 W
  • GB 9803063 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9941809A1] The jack plug comprises a number of sections, the diameters of which increase successively with distance from the tip of the jack plug. Additionally, or alternatively, the diameter of the socket decreases, continuously or in steps, with distance from the insertion end of the socket. These features reduce the likelihood of the jack plug snagging during withdrawal and also reduce bending stress experienced by the jack plug if it is withdrawn using an off axis force.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01R 24/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/58 (2011.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01R 24/58 (2013.01); H01R 2105/00 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9941809A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9941809 A1 19990819; AU 2535399 A 19990830; DE 69916814 D1 20040603; DE 69916814 T2 20050127; EP 1066662 A1 20010110; EP 1066662 B1 20040428; GB 9803063 D0 19980408

INPADOC legal status

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160119

- Year of fee payment: 18

2008-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060228

2007-01-05 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Ref Legal Event Code: ST

- Effective date: 20061031

2006-09-01 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20060901

2005-04-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20050131

2005-02-16 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050216

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20050131

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-01-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2004-06-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 69916814

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2004-06-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2004-04-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2004-04-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2004-04-28 [RIC1] CLASSIFICATION (CORRECTION)

- Ref Legal Event Code: RIC1

- IPC: 7H 01R 24/04 A

2001-07-11 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010523

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000911

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB