Global Patent Index - EP 1066668 A1

EP 1066668 A1 2001-01-10 - GAS-FILLED DISCHARGE GAP

Title (en)

GAS-FILLED DISCHARGE GAP

Title (de)

GASGEFÜLLTE ENTLADUNGSSTRECKE

Title (fr)

INTERVALLE DE DECHARGE REMPLI DE GAZ

Publication

EP 1066668 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99922055 A

Priority

  • DE 9900814 W
  • DE 19814631 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19814631A1] The purpose of the present invention is to prevent excessive variations, after application of a load, in the DC priming voltage Uag of gas-filled discharge gaps that include a vitreous-type electrode-activation mass comprising a plurality of components. To this end, the base components of the electrode-activation mass (4) include not only sodium silicate, cesium silicate and titanium, but also potassium silicate and cesium tungstate.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H01T 1/22; H01J 17/04; H01J 17/40

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H01T 1/22 (2006.01); H01T 4/12 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H01T 1/22 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949545A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

DE 19814631 A1 19990930; CN 1227790 C 20051116; CN 1298563 A 20010606; EP 1066668 A1 20010110; EP 1066668 B1 20030212; JP 2002508580 A 20020319; JP 4112176 B2 20080702; US 6326724 B1 20011204; WO 9949545 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2017-04-28 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20170323

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170322

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-03-23 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-03-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-01-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150312

2015-11-25 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20150312

2014-06-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20140324

- Year of fee payment: 16

2004-02-04 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20031113

2003-10-17 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-08-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: EPCOS AG

2003-08-13 [RAP2] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP GRANTED PATENT

- Owner name: SIEMENS VACUUM ELECTRONIC COMPONENTS CO., LTD.

2003-04-23 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20030401

2003-03-20 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59904276 P 20030320

2003-02-12 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB

2003-02-12 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2001-08-01 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010618

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000907

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB