Global Patent Index - EP 1066720 A1

EP 1066720 A1 2001-01-10 - APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING AND FILTERING TRANSMITTED PROGRAMS

Title (en)

APPARATUS AND METHOD FOR RECEIVING AND FILTERING TRANSMITTED PROGRAMS

Title (de)

VORRICHTUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUM EMPFANG UND FILTERN VON ÜBERTRAGENEN PROGRAMMEN

Title (fr)

APPAREIL ET PROCEDE PERMETTANT DE RECEVOIR ET DE FILTRER DES PROGRAMMES TRANSMIS

Publication

EP 1066720 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00903596 A

Priority

  • EP 00903596 A
  • EP 0000435 W
  • EP 99200277 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO0046990A1] The invention relates to an apparatus and a method for transmitting or receiving programs. Along with the programs, additional data pertaining to the programs is transmitted or received. The additional data comprises a format descriptor and a topic descriptor, which specify respectively a format of a program, for example movie or magazine, and a topic of said program, for example sports or politics. The user is allowed to select programs in accordance with conditions upon the format descriptor and the topic descriptor.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04N 7/088

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04H 20/00 (2008.01); H04N 5/445 (2011.01); H04N 7/08 (2006.01); H04N 7/081 (2006.01); H04N 7/088 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04N 5/44543 (2013.01); H04N 21/4345 (2013.01); H04N 21/454 (2013.01); H04N 21/4828 (2013.01); H04N 21/84 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 0046990A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

WO 0046990 A1 20000810; EP 1066720 A1 20010110; JP 2002536924 A 20021029

INPADOC legal status


2010-02-17 [18R] REFUSED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18R

- Effective date: 20090702

2004-09-29 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040813

2004-05-26 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-04-11 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010212

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE