Global Patent Index - EP 1066733 A1

EP 1066733 A1 2001-01-10 - DYNAMIC BANDWIDTH MANAGEMENT AND REROUTING

Title (en)

DYNAMIC BANDWIDTH MANAGEMENT AND REROUTING

Title (de)

DYNAMISCHE VERWALTUNG DER BANDBREITE UND UMLEITUNG

Title (fr)

GESTION ET REACHEMINEMENT DE LARGEUR DE BANDE DYNAMIQUE

Publication

EP 1066733 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99910060 A

Priority

  • CA 9900259 W
  • CA 2233395 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9949693A1] A communications network performs a variety of maintenance actions. One of those actions is rerouting of a connection path. A feature called "dynamic resource management option" allows the network or the called party of an active connection to initiate a resource change procedure when needs arise. The resource change can also be achieved by rerouting the existing path of the active connection. However a maintenance action taken in one network domain is only effected within the same domain, because a different domain may have different maintenance procedures. Telecommunication connections often span more than one domain and a request for resource adjustment must be considered differently for a proper maintenance action. A resource change indication message includes a flag to indicate the message originated within or outside the domain. By observing the flag, it is possible to decide on a proper maintenance procedure.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04L 12/911 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04Q 11/0478 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5621 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5627 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5634 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0081 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0086 (2013.01); H04Q 2011/0088 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949693A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR GB

EPO simple patent family

WO 9949693 A1 19990930; AU 2917999 A 19991018; CA 2233395 A1 19990926; EP 1066733 A1 20010110; JP 2002516497 A 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2006-03-08 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20050820

2004-04-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20040315

2003-10-08 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED

2001-01-24 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: NORTEL NETWORKS LIMITED

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001026

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR GB