Global Patent Index - EP 1066734 A1

EP 1066734 A1 2001-01-10 - METHOD FOR FORWARDING DIGITAL INFORMATION GENERATED IN A TDMA SYSTEM VIA AN ATM TRANSMISSION PATH

Title (en)

METHOD FOR FORWARDING DIGITAL INFORMATION GENERATED IN A TDMA SYSTEM VIA AN ATM TRANSMISSION PATH

Title (de)

VERFAHREN ZUM WEITERLEITEN DIGITALER, IN EINEM TDMA-SYSTEM ERZEUGTEN INFORMATION ÜBER EINE ATM-ÜBERTRAGUNGSSTRECKE

Title (fr)

PROCEDE DE TRANSMISSION, PAR L'INTERMEDIAIRE D'UNE SECTION DE TRANSMISSION MTA, D'UNE INFORMATION NUMERIQUE PRODUITE DANS UN SYSTEME AMRT

Publication

EP 1066734 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 99911616 A

Priority

  • DE 9900484 W
  • DE 19813502 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19813502C1] The method involves putting transmission frames of each connection in ATM cells and transmitting the cells via an ATM transmission path. The time points for the completion of the transmission frames of the connection for the carrier frequencies of the TDMA system is so selected that the time points are evenly distributed over each time frame of the TDMA system. Preferably, the information is generated in a mobile radio system and are transmitted in ATM cells from a base station (FP1) to control and process units of the mobile radio network. The information is transmitted in ATM cells to a base station controller (BSC).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H04Q 11/04

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H04J 3/00 (2006.01); H04L 12/28 (2006.01); H04Q 7/38 (2006.01); H04Q 11/04 (2006.01); H04L 12/70 (2013.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H04Q 11/0478 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5607 (2013.01); H04L 2012/5672 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9949694A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES GB NL PT

EPO simple patent family

DE 19813502 C1 19990923; CN 1135900 C 20040121; CN 1295777 A 20010516; EP 1066734 A1 20010110; EP 1066734 B1 20020116; ES 2172313 T3 20020916; JP 2002508639 A 20020319; JP 3472264 B2 20031202; PT 1066734 E 20020731; WO 9949694 A1 19990930

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160823

2016-11-07 [REG NL MM] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: MM

- Effective date: 20160301

2016-05-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160217

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-04-29 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160218

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-04-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150225

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-04-30 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150214

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-03-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20150218

- Year of fee payment: 17

2015-02-04 [REG NL TD] MODIFICATIONS OF NAMES OF PROPRIETORS OF PATENTS

- Ref Legal Event Code: TD

- Effective date: 20150126

2014-11-27 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Owner name: NOKIA SOLUTIONS AND NETWORKS GMBH & CO.KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

- Effective date: 20141121

2014-09-11 [REG DE R081] CHANGE OF APPLICANT/PATENTEE

- Owner name: NOKIA SOLUTIONS AND NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R081

- Ref Document Number: 59900635

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Effective date: 20140731

2008-07-10 [REG PT PC4A] TRANSFER OF ASSIGNMENT

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG, DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC4A

- Effective date: 20080630

2008-04-23 [REG GB 732E] AMENDMENTS TO THE REGISTER IN RESPECT OF CHANGES OF NAME OR CHANGES AFFECTING RIGHTS (SECT. 32/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: 732E

2008-04-01 [NLS] NL: ASSIGNMENTS OF EP-PATENTS

- Owner name: NOKIA SIEMENS NETWORKS GMBH & CO. KG

- Ref Legal Event Code: NLS

- Effective date: 20080115

2008-02-16 [REG ES PC2A] TRANSFER OF PATENT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PC2A

2003-01-08 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

2002-09-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG2A

- Ref Document Number: 2172313

- Country of Ref Document: ES

- Kind Code of Ref Document: T3

2002-07-31 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Ref Legal Event Code: SC4A

- Free Format Text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20020411

2002-05-01 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBT

- Effective date: 20020407

2002-02-21 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 59900635

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2002-02-21

2002-01-16 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB NL PT

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

- Ref Legal Event Code: IF02

2001-07-18 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20010611

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20000531

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES GB NL PT