Global Patent Index - EP 1066737 B1

EP 1066737 B1 2002-09-18 - BOTTOM FOR A METALLURGICAL VESSEL WITH A DIRECT CURRENT ELECTRIC ARC DEVICE

Title (en)

BOTTOM FOR A METALLURGICAL VESSEL WITH A DIRECT CURRENT ELECTRIC ARC DEVICE

Title (de)

BODEN EINES METALLURGISCHEN GEFÄSSES MIT EINER GLEICHSTROMLICHTBOGENEINRICHTUNG

Title (fr)

FOND D'UN RECIPIENT METALLURGIQUE DOTE D'UN DISPOSITIF A ARC COURANT CONTINU

Publication

EP 1066737 B1 (DE)

Application

EP 99916773 A

Priority

  • DE 9900631 W
  • DE 19815154 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: DE19815154C1] The bottom (12) of a metallurgical vessel (11) is provided with an electrically nonconductive sleeve (31) which envelops the part of the anode (21) extending into the metallurgical vessel, and forms an exit channel (37). The distance ( DELTA r) from the anode (21) is selected such that metals with a low melting point can flow without hindrance from the vessel (11).

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 7/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 7/02 (2006.01); F27B 3/08 (2006.01); F27B 3/10 (2006.01); F27B 3/19 (2006.01); F27D 11/08 (2006.01); H05B 7/06 (2006.01); F27D 3/15 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 7/06 (2013.01); F27B 3/10 (2013.01); F27B 3/19 (2013.01); F27B 3/085 (2013.01); F27D 3/1509 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU SE

EPO simple patent family

DE 19815154 C1 19990805; AT 224632 T 20021015; AU 3515599 A 19991018; BR 9909144 A 20001205; CA 2326181 A1 19991007; CN 1295779 A 20010516; EP 1066737 A2 20010110; EP 1066737 B1 20020918; ES 2184436 T3 20030401; JP 2002510786 A 20020409; KR 20010034658 A 20010425; SK 14202000 A3 20010611; TR 200002763 T2 20001221; US 6485675 B1 20021126; WO 9951065 A2 19991007; WO 9951065 A3 20000113

INPADOC legal status


2015-01-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141001

2015-01-29 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902756

- Effective date: 20141001

2014-10-01 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59902756

2013-04-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130321

- Year of fee payment: 15

2005-03-03 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20050303

2004-08-16 [REG ES FD2A] ANNOUNCEMENT OF LAPSE IN SPAIN

- Effective date: 20030304

2004-01-02 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

2003-11-27 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20031127

2003-11-14 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2003-11-04 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2003-10-22 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

2003-09-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: *SMS DEMAG A.G.

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-09-10 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20030619

2003-04-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2184436 T3

2003-03-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030331

2003-03-04 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-03-04 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030304

2003-03-03 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-03-03 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030303

2003-03-03 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20030303

2002-11-08 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-11-06 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20021014

2002-10-24 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59902756 20021024

2002-10-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: E. BLUM & CO. PATENTANWAELTE

2002-09-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-09-18 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU SE

2002-09-18 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2002-09-18 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 224632 T 20021015

2001-05-16 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010328

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000926

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A2

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH DE ES FR GB IT LI LU SE