Global Patent Index - EP 1066739 A1

EP 1066739 A1 2001-01-10 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE RECTIFICATION EFFECT OCCURRING IN A GAS-DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (en)

METHOD AND DEVICE FOR DETECTING THE RECTIFICATION EFFECT OCCURRING IN A GAS-DISCHARGE LAMP

Title (de)

VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUM ERFASSEN DES IN EINER GASENTLADUNGSLAMPE AUFTRETENDEN GLEICHRICHTEFFEKTS

Title (fr)

PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF PERMETTANT DE DETECTER L'EFFET REDRESSEUR APPARAISSANT DANS UNE LAMPE A DECHARGE

Publication

EP 1066739 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 98956934 A

Priority

  • DE 19757635 A
  • DE 19829434 A
  • EP 9807428 W

Abstract (en)

[origin: WO9934647A1] The invention relates to a method for detecting the rectification effect occurring in a gas-discharge lamp (G1, G2) and to an electronic lamp ballast for operating a gas-discharge lamp (G1, G2) with which such a method is used. The electronic lamp ballast comprises a monitoring or control circuit (IC2) which monitors an operating variable of a load circuit (E) of the electronic lamp ballast, whereby said operating variable corresponds to or is dependent on the lamp voltage. The monitoring circuit (IC2) integrates this monitored operating variable for a full period and infers the presence of a rectification effect if the integration result deviates from a predetermined integration set value. In addition, in order to detect the rectification effect the duration of the positive and negative half waves of the variables being monitored can be compared.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

H05B 41/28

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/298 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

H05B 41/2985 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

See references of WO 9934647A1

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

WO 9934647 A1 19990708; AT 213901 T 20020315; AU 1339599 A 19990719; AU 738151 B2 20010913; DE 19882031 D2 20001012; EP 1066739 A1 20010110; EP 1066739 B1 20020227; NO 20003259 A 20000821; NO 20003259 D0 20000622; NO 325778 B1 20080714; NZ 505209 A 20021220; US 6400095 B1 20020604

INPADOC legal status


2017-08-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20170731

2017-04-28 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20170131

- Year of fee payment: 19

2017-01-31 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20161130

- Year of fee payment: 19

2016-02-29 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20151130

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-12-31 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141119

2015-11-30 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-08-31 [PG25 AT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20141119

2015-07-15 [REG AT MM01] LAPSE BECAUSE OF NOT PAYING ANNUAL FEES

- Document: AT 213901 T

- Effective date: 20141119

2014-02-28 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20131127

- Year of fee payment: 16

2014-01-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20131128

- Year of fee payment: 16

2013-07-31 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-07-31 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20121130

2013-06-28 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2012-01-31 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20111130

- Year of fee payment: 14

2008-06-25 [REG CH PFA] NAME/FIRM CHANGED

- Owner name: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH

- Free text: TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#FAERBERGASSE 15#6851 DORNBIRN (AT) -TRANSFER TO- TRIDONIC BAUELEMENTE GMBH#FAERBERGASSE 15#6851 DORNBIRN (AT)

2003-02-26 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20021128

2002-08-29 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020829

2002-08-09 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2002-08-01 [NLV1] NL: LAPSED OR ANNULLED DUE TO FAILURE TO FULFILL THE REQUIREMENTS OF ART. 29P AND 29M OF THE PATENTS ACT

2002-06-12 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20020522

2002-05-27 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020527

2002-04-04 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59803245 20020404

2002-03-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: A. BRAUN, BRAUN, HERITIER, ESCHMANN AG PATENTANWAE

2002-02-28 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2002-02-27 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE

2002-02-27 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20020227

2002-02-27 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: AT 213901 T 20020315

2002-01-01 [REG GB IF02] EUROPEAN PATENT IN FORCE AS OF 2002-01-01

2001-05-23 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20010409

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20000517

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT CH DE ES FI FR GB IT LI NL SE