Global Patent Index - EP 1066755 A1

EP 1066755 A1 2001-01-10 - Method and means for supplying animals with liquid food

Title (en)

Method and means for supplying animals with liquid food

Title (de)

Verfahren und Eirichtung zum Versorgen von Haustieren mit einem flüssigen Nahrungsmittel

Title (fr)

Procédé et dispositif pour alimenter des animaux avec un aliment liquide

Publication

EP 1066755 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00120069 A

Priority

  • DE 29613366 U
  • DE 29605928 U
  • EP 97105481 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: EP0799567A2] The liquid feed supply, for domestic animals, uses a static pressure for the liquid feed to flow through the hose (2) to the suckling point (4). A mixing container (1) may be arranged above the suckling point. Additionally, a supply container (9) may also be arranged above the suckling point. The suckling point may be connected in series with a valve (6).

Abstract (de)

Bei einem Verfahren zur Versorgung von Haustieren mit einem flüssigen Nahrungsmittel, das aus einem Vorratsbehälter, insbesondere einem Mischbehälter (1) eines Tränkeautomaten, über eine Saugleitung (2) zu einer Saugstelle (4, 4.5) gelangt, soll zum Antränken von Tieren, insbesondere Jungtieren durch in Betrieb nehmen einer in die Saugleitung (2) eingesetzten Pumpe (10.5) Nahrungsmittel zur Saugstelle (4.5) befördert werden. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A01K 9/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A01K 5/02 (2006.01); A01K 9/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A01K 5/0216 (2013.01); A01K 9/00 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 0799567 A2 19971008; EP 0799567 A3 19980121; DE 59712411 D1 20051006; EP 0947132 A2 19991006; EP 0947132 A3 19991215; EP 0947132 B1 20050831; EP 1066755 A1 20010110; EP 1066755 B1 20040728

INPADOC legal status


2013-06-28 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20111031

2012-01-31 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20110502

2012-01-20 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20111230

2011-10-31 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 59711815

2011-05-31 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20090403

2011-03-31 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100402

2011-02-28 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-02-28 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20100430

2011-01-31 [PG25 NL] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-12-29 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Effective date: 20100402

2010-11-30 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20100629

- Year of fee payment: 14

2010-11-30 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2010-11-10 [REG NL V1] LAPSED BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF THE ANNUAL FEE

- Effective date: 20101101

2010-07-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20100506

- Year of fee payment: 14

2009-12-15 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090421

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-10-30 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 13

2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070402

2009-08-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090415

- Year of fee payment: 13

2008-10-31 [PGFP SE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Payment date: 20080414

- Year of fee payment: 12

2006-04-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060430

- Year of fee payment: 10

2005-07-20 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050429

2005-03-04 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-10-26 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-09-02 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 59711815 P 20040902

2004-08-18 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040728

2004-07-30 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-07-30 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ARIE WUBBEN

2004-07-28 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 0799567 P

2004-07-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2004-07-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2003-08-27 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030711

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE

2001-05-02 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010309

2001-01-10 [AC] DIVISIONAL APPLICATION (ART. 76) OF:

- Document: EP 799567

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): CH DE FR GB IT LI NL SE