Global Patent Index - EP 1066763 A1

EP 1066763 A1 2001-01-10 - Panty pantyhose combination garment and method for forming same

Title (en)

Panty pantyhose combination garment and method for forming same

Title (de)

Kombinierung Unterhose-Strumpfhose und Herstellungsverfahren

Title (fr)

Combinaison collant-culotte et méthode de fabrication

Publication

EP 1066763 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99305248 A

Priority

EP 99305248 A

Abstract (en)

A circularly knit tubular hosiery member and garment formed therefrom and a method for producing both. The member has a first tubular portion with a lateral portion having a plurality of courses with short stitch lengths. The garment is formed from a pair of the members disposed in a side-by-side relationship, slit along a part of their length and joined at pairs of the edges thus formed to provide a panty section with front, rear and lateral portions. The lengths of the stitches in the courses in the lateral portions are shorter than the stitch lengths in the front and rear panty portions so that the panty section has an arcuately shaped leg profile within the lateral portions. The method includes forming the panty pantyhose combination garment from the two separate tubular members with the stitches in the courses of the lateral portions made smaller than the stitch lengths in the rear and front portions. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A41B 11/14; A41B 9/00; D04B 1/24

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A41B 11/14 (2006.01); D04B 1/24 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A41B 11/14 (2013.01); D04B 1/243 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066763 A1 20010110

INPADOC legal status


2004-12-29 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20040623

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021004

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: IMBODEN, H.WALTER

2001-07-04 [RIN1] INVENTOR (CORRECTION)

- Inventor name: MYERS, M.JONATHAN

2001-05-30 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010330

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI