Global Patent Index - EP 1066767 A1

EP 1066767 A1 2001-01-10 - Footwear provided with soft and watertight upper

Title (en)

Footwear provided with soft and watertight upper

Title (de)

Schuhwerk mit weichem, nachgebendem, wasserdichtem Oberleder

Title (fr)

Article chaussant à tige souple étanche à l'eau

Publication

EP 1066767 A1 (FR)

Application

EP 00810573 A

Priority

CH 126899 A

Abstract (en)

Supple leg part (1) comprises two flaps (5, 6). Flap (6) has, on its outer side, first fold (7) extending along edge of flap, and second fold (8) placed not far from first fold but such that second fold is covered by flap (5) when shoe is closed. When flap (5) is locked on other flap (6) using handle, folds are used as impervious barriers.

Abstract (fr)

Article chaussant comprenant une tige souple (1) étanche à l'eau, présentant une ouverture se fermant par la superposition au moins partielle d'au moins deux parties (5, 6) de la tige. L'une au moins des surfaces venant en contact mutuel lors de la superposition des parties de la tige présente au moins un bourrelet (7, 8) formant barrière d'étanchéité. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A43B 5/04; A43B 7/12

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/04 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A43B 5/0415 (2013.01); A43B 5/0405 (2013.01); A43B 5/0476 (2013.01); A43B 5/0482 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE FR IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066767 A1 20010110; EP 1066767 B1 20040714; CH 694146 A5 20040813; DE 60012092 D1 20040819; DE 60012092 T2 20050825

INPADOC legal status


2009-09-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070630

2008-09-30 [PG25 FR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070702

2008-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20080101

2008-04-25 [REG FR ST] NOTIFICATION OF LAPSE

- Effective date: 20080229

2006-06-30 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20060630

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-06-19 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20060619

- Year of fee payment: 7

2006-06-16 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20060616

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-07-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20050415

2004-08-19 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 60012092 P 20040819

2004-07-14 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2002-11-20 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20021004

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE FR IT

2001-01-10 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20001021

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE FR IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI