Global Patent Index - EP 1066771 A1

EP 1066771 A1 2001-01-10 - Applicator and assembly

Title (en)

Applicator and assembly

Title (de)

Kosmetikeinheit und deren Zusammensetzung

Title (fr)

Applicateur et ensemble d'application

Publication

EP 1066771 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00305609 A

Priority

  • GB 9915947 A
  • GB 0005503 A

Abstract (en)

A cosmetics applicator assembly, especially a mascara brush, comprising a cap 8 to a container having a wiper 6 in its neck 3, has a stop 20 at the end of a rod 12, immediately above the applicator 14, the rod tapering towards the stop. The wiper is provided with fingers 22 which bear against the rod so that as the applicator is withdrawn from the container as the tapered portion passes them they relax until their ends contact the stop which inverts them as it passes, the fingers remaining inturned until the applicator passes them when they will revert to their relaxed state removing any blob of cosmetic from the end of the applicator. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A45D 40/26

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A45D 34/04 (2006.01); A45D 40/26 (2006.01); A46B 3/18 (2006.01); A46B 9/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A45D 40/267 (2013.01); A46B 3/18 (2013.01); A46B 9/021 (2013.01); A46B 2200/1053 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR GB IT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066771 A1 20010110; EP 1066771 B1 20050928; DE 60022828 D1 20051103; DE 60022828 T2 20060706; GB 0016320 D0 20000823; GB 2352167 A 20010124; JP 2001061547 A 20010313; JP 4722259 B2 20110713

INPADOC legal status


2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20160722

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-07-22 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Ref Legal Event Code: PLFP

- Year of fee payment: 17

2016-04-29 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20160202

2016-04-29 [PG25 GB] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150703

2016-03-23 [GBPC] GB: EUROPEAN PATENT CEASED THROUGH NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: GBPC

- Effective date: 20150703

2016-02-02 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R119

- Ref Document Number: 60022828

- Country of Ref Document: DE

2014-11-28 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140721

- Year of fee payment: 15

2014-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Ref Legal Event Code: PGFP

- Payment date: 20140724

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-06-14 [REG DE R082] CHANGE OF REPRESENTATIVE

- Ref Legal Event Code: R082

- Ref Document Number: 60022828

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Representative's name: MARTIN MISSELHORN PATENT- UND RECHTSANWALT, DE

2010-12-17 [REG FR CD] CHANGE OF NAME OR COMPANY NAME

- Ref Legal Event Code: CD

2006-09-06 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 26N

- Effective date: 20060629

2006-05-12 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: ET

2006-01-08 [PG25 ES] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20060108

2005-11-03 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Ref Legal Event Code: REF

- Ref Document Number: 60022828

- Country of Ref Document: DE

- Date of Ref Document: 2005-11-03

- Kind Code of Ref Document: P

2005-09-28 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2005-09-28 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Ref Legal Event Code: FG4D

2005-09-28 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Ref Legal Event Code: PG25

- Free Format Text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20050928

2004-03-17 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17Q

- Effective date: 20040128

2002-04-17 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-10-10 [RBV] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES (CORRECTION):

- Ref Legal Event Code: RBV

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

- Free Format Text: AT BE CH CY DE LI

2001-08-16 [RAP1] TRANSFER OF RIGHTS OF AN EP PUBLISHED APPLICATION

- Owner name: GEKA BRUSH GMBH

- Ref Legal Event Code: RAP1

2001-05-16 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Ref Legal Event Code: 17P

- Effective date: 20010317

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR GB IT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI