Global Patent Index - EP 1066772 A1

EP 1066772 A1 2001-01-10 - Support structure for wine barrels

Title (en)

Support structure for wine barrels

Title (de)

Tragstruktur für Weinfässer

Title (fr)

Stucture de support pour des tonneaux de vin

Publication

EP 1066772 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 99500111 A

Priority

EP 99500111 A

Abstract (en)

The support structure consists of four saddle pieces (1), which may stand directly on the floor or joined to other supports in a stacking arrangement, each of which saddle pieces is joined to a framework comprising two lower diverging tubes (6), which, as well as forming part of the support's load bearing structure, act as support elements on which the barrel (7) is rested, and likewise comprising two upper, vertical tubes (10), acting as spacers between supports when in a stacking arrangement; said frameworks are linked in pairs, in a lateral, coplanar fashion, such that the two front, joined frameworks, are joined to the rear pair by means of crosspieces (12). The saddle pieces (1) feature openings (2) through which may be inserted the prongs of a forklift truck and, on their lower part, receptacles (3) tapering upwards, with an opening on their lower face, designed to fit onto the vertical tubes (10) when several supports are stacked upon each other, enabling the self-centering of same. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 81/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/00 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 81/007 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

DE ES FR IT PT

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066772 A1 20010110; EP 1066772 B1 20030402; DE 69906499 D1 20030508; DE 69906499 T2 20040304; ES 2169713 T1 20020716; ES 2169713 T3 20031101; PT 1066772 E 20030731

INPADOC legal status


2016-12-30 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20160708

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-11-30 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20160713

- Year of fee payment: 18

2016-07-13 [REG FR PLFP] FEE PAYMENT

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Year of fee payment: 18

2015-05-21 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69906499

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 IT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20140706

2015-04-30 [PG25 DE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150203

2015-04-30 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20150106

2015-02-03 [REG DE R119] APPLICATION DEEMED WITHDRAWN, OR IP RIGHT LAPSED, DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF RENEWAL FEE

- Document: DE 69906499

2015-01-13 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Free text: LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES

- Effective date: 20150106

2013-12-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20130716

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP PT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Payment date: 20130107

- Year of fee payment: 15

2013-10-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20130731

- Year of fee payment: 15

2004-03-24 [26N] NO OPPOSITION FILED

- Effective date: 20040105

2003-11-28 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2003-11-01 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169713 T3

2003-05-08 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 69906499 P 20030508

2003-04-02 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2002-08-14 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20020627

2002-07-16 [REG ES BA2A] PROVISIONAL PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2169713 T1

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: DE ES FR IT PT

2001-05-23 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010320

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): DE ES FR IT PT

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI