Global Patent Index - EP 1066773 A1

EP 1066773 A1 2001-01-10 - Slide

Title (en)

Slide

Title (de)

Ausziehführung

Title (fr)

Glissière

Publication

EP 1066773 A1 (DE)

Application

EP 00110761 A

Priority

DE 19931842 A

Abstract (en)

The guide (10) has at least two guide rails (14,18,26), which slide in one other in the longitudinal direction. A bearing unit has several cylindrical rollers held between the guide rails, with one roller (52,57) horizontal and the other two rollers (53-56) inclined to form a triangle. Each guide rail engages the triangle formed by the rollers by a support bar between the rollers. The guide (10) has at least two guide rails (14,18,26), which slide in one other in the longitudinal direction. One guide rail is fixed to a furniture part (12) and a further guide rail is fixed to a drawer (20). A bearing unit has several cylindrical rollers held between the guide rails with their axes perpendicular to the withdrawal direction. At least one roller (52,57) is arranged horizontally between the guide rails and at least two rollers (53-56) are inclined to the horizontal between the guide rails, so that the roller axes form a triangle in the withdrawal direction. Each guide rail engages the triangle formed by the rollers by a support bar (27) between the horizontal and the inclined rollers.

Abstract (de)

Eine Ausziehführung für Schubladen, Arbeitsplatten und andere ausziehbare Möbelteile (16) ist mit mindestens zwei Führungsschienen (14, 18, 26, 84, 88) versehen, die in Längsrichtung durch Lagereinheiten verschiebbar zueinander gehalten sind, wobei eine Führungsschiene an einem feststehenden Teil (12, 82), wie einem Möbelkorpus, befestigbar ist und eine weitere Führungsschiene an dem ausziehbaren Möbelteil (20, 86) befestigbar ist. Eine zwischen zwei Führungsschienen gehaltene Lagereinheit weist mehrere zylindrische Wälzkörper (52, 53, 54; 55, 56, 57; 90, 91, 92) auf, deren Wälzkörperachsen senkrecht zur Verschieberichtung angeordnet sind, wobei mindestens ein Wälzkörper (52, 57, 90) einer Lagereinheit im eingebauten Zustand im wesentlichen horizontal zwischen zwei Führungsschienen angeordnet ist und zwei Wälzkörper (53, 54; 55, 56; 91, 92) mit der Wälzkörperachse zur Horizontalen geneigt zwischen den zwei Führungsschienen angeordnet sind, so daß die Wälzkörperachsen der Wälzkörper einer Lagereinheit in Verschieberichtung gesehen ein Dreieck bilden. Dabei greift jeweils eine Führungsschiene über einen Tragsteg (27, 85) zwischen dem im wesentlichen horizontal angordneten Wälzkörper (52, 57, 90) und einem geneigt angeordneten Wälzkörper (53, 54, 55, 56, 91, 92) in das durch die Wälzkörperachsen gebildete Dreieck eingreift, so daß eine Führungsschiene die geneigt angeordneten Wälzkörper zusammenhält und ein Auseinanderspreizen dieser Wälzkörper vermieden wird. <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47B 88/14

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/14 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47B 88/487 (2017.01); A47B 2210/001 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0032 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0056 (2013.01); A47B 2210/0059 (2013.01)

Citation (applicant)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066773 A1 20010110; EP 1066773 B1 20040107; AT 257345 T 20040115; BR 0002653 A 20010313; DE 19931842 A1 20010111; DE 19931842 B4 20110310; DK 1066773 T3 20040322; ES 2211413 T3 20040716; PT 1066773 E 20040430; US 6347849 B1 20020219

INPADOC legal status


2010-03-10 [27W] REVOKED

- Effective date: 20091001

2010-03-10 [GBPR] GB: PATENT REVOKED UNDER ART. 102 OF THE EP CONVENTION DESIGNATING THE UK AS CONTRACTING STATE

- Effective date: 20091001

2009-11-30 [PGFP GB] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: GB

- Payment date: 20090528

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP AT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: AT

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP DE] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: DE

- Payment date: 20090417

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP FR] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: FR

- Payment date: 20090519

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-08-31 [PGFP IT] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: IT

- Payment date: 20090527

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP ES] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: ES

- Payment date: 20090522

- Year of fee payment: 10

2009-07-31 [PGFP NL] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: NL

- Payment date: 20090520

- Year of fee payment: 10

2008-02-29 [PG25 LI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-02-29 [PG25 CH] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20070531

2008-01-15 [REG CH PL] PATENT CEASED

2007-09-28 [REG CH PCAR] CHANGE OF THE ADDRESS OF THE REPRESENTATIVE

- Free text: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG;POSTFACH 1772;8027 ZUERICH (CH)

2006-05-24 [PGFP CH] POSTGRANT: ANNUAL FEES PAID TO NATIONAL OFFICE

- Ref Country Code: CH

- Payment date: 20060524

- Year of fee payment: 7

2005-02-01 [NLR1] NL: OPPOSITION HAS BEEN FILED WITH THE EPO

- Opponent name: JULIUS BLUM GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

2005-01-31 [REG PT MM4A] ANNULMENT/LAPSE DUE TO NON-PAYMENT OF FEES, SEARCHED AND EXAMINED PATENT

- Effective date: 20041119

2005-01-03 [REG DK EBP] PATENT LAPSED

2004-12-28 [EUG] SE: EUROPEAN PATENT HAS LAPSED

2004-12-03 [PG25 GR] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: GR

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041203

2004-12-01 [26] OPPOSITION FILED

- Opponent name: JULIUS BLUM GESELLSCHAFT M.B.H.

- Effective date: 20041007

2004-11-30 [BERE] BE: LAPSED

- Owner name: PAUL *HETTICH G.M.B.H. & CO.

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-11-19 [PG25 PT] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: PT

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20041119

2004-11-05 [ET] FR: TRANSLATION FILED

2004-08-25 [REG IE FD4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS DESIGNATING IRELAND TREATED AS ALWAYS HAVING BEEN VOID

2004-07-16 [REG ES FG2A] DEFINITIVE PROTECTION

- Document: ES 2211413 T3

2004-06-01 [PG25 DK] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: DK

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040601

2004-05-31 [PG25 BE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: BE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-31 [PG25 MC] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: MC

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040531

2004-05-20 [PG25 SE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: SE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040520

2004-05-19 [PG25 FI] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: FI

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-05-19 [PG25 LU] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: LU

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF NON-PAYMENT OF DUE FEES

- Effective date: 20040519

2004-04-30 [REG PT SC4A] TRANSLATION IS AVAILABLE

- Free text: AVAILABILITY OF NATIONAL TRANSLATION

- Effective date: 20040308

2004-04-27 [REG SE TRGR] TRANSLATION OF GRANTED EP PATENT

2004-04-22 [REG GR EP] EP PATENT VALIDATED IN GREECE

- Document: GR 20040400884

2004-04-07 [GBC] GB: TRANSLATION OF CLAIMS FILED (GB SECTION 78(7)/1977)

2004-03-22 [REG DK T3] TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT

2004-03-10 [GBT] GB: TRANSLATION OF EP PATENT FILED (GB SECTION 77(6)(A)/1977)

- Effective date: 20040212

2004-02-12 [REF] CORRESPONDS TO:

- Document: DE 50004961 P 20040212

2004-02-11 [REG IE FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENTS GRANTED DESIGNATING IRELAND

- Free text: GERMAN

2004-01-15 [REG CH EP] ENTRY IN THE NATIONAL PHASE

2004-01-15 [REG CH NV] NEW AGENT

- Representative's name: ISLER & PEDRAZZINI AG

2004-01-07 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: B1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2004-01-07 [REG GB FG4D] EUROPEAN PATENT GRANTED

- Free text: NOT ENGLISH

2004-01-07 [PG25 CY] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: CY

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2004-01-07 [PG25 IE] LAPSED IN A CONTRACTING STATE ANNOUNCED VIA POSTGRANT INFORM. FROM NAT. OFFICE TO EPO

- Ref Country Code: IE

- Free text: LAPSE BECAUSE OF FAILURE TO SUBMIT A TRANSLATION OF THE DESCRIPTION OR TO PAY THE FEE WITHIN THE PRESCRIBED TIME-LIMIT

- Effective date: 20040107

2003-05-02 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030313

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-08-22 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010628

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI