Global Patent Index - EP 1066777 A1

EP 1066777 A1 2001-01-10 - Support device for furniture structures

Title (en)

Support device for furniture structures

Title (de)

Tragvorrichtung für Möbelaufbau

Title (fr)

Dispositif de support pour structures de meubles

Publication

EP 1066777 A1 (EN)

Application

EP 00114564 A

Priority

IT MO990149 A

Abstract (en)

A support device (1) for a furniture structure suitable to constitute the support for the body of a person sitting or lying on said furniture structure, includes frame means (2) associable to the frame of the furniture structure, support means (5) for the body of said person constituted by sheet means (5) secured to said frame means (2). <IMAGE>

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47C 19/02

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A47C 19/02 (2006.01); A47C 23/06 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47C 19/021 (2013.01)

Citation (search report)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

EP 1066777 A1 20010110; IT 1310629 B1 20020219; IT MO990149 A1 20010108; IT MO990149 D0 19990708

INPADOC legal status


2006-07-05 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Effective date: 20051213

2003-05-28 [17Q] FIRST EXAMINATION REPORT

- Effective date: 20030414

2001-09-26 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Free text: AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-09-19 [17P] REQUEST FOR EXAMINATION FILED

- Effective date: 20010710

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Kind Code of Ref Document: A1

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Free text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI