Global Patent Index - EP 1066782 A9

EP 1066782 A9 2001-03-14 - Rotatable and releasable sports ball display mechanism

Title (en)

Rotatable and releasable sports ball display mechanism

Title (de)

Drehbarer und lösbarer Präsentationsmechanismus für Sportbälle

Title (fr)

Mécanisme rotatif et amovible de présentation de ballons de sport

Publication

EP 1066782 A9 (EN)

Application

EP 00303092 A

Priority

US 29174199 A

Abstract (en)

[origin: US6029826A] A rotatable sports ball display mechanism that utilizes a pair of pressure applying, aligned adjustment members, secured to a C-configured bracket, and mounting hook and pile type fastening members. By the use of such fastening members, only limited pressure is needed to rotatably secure a sports ball to the bracket.

IPC 1-7 (main, further and additional classification)

A47F 7/00; A47G 33/00

IPC 8 full level (invention and additional information)

A63B 47/00 (2006.01); A47F 5/02 (2006.01); A47F 7/00 (2006.01); A47G 33/00 (2006.01); B44C 5/02 (2006.01)

CPC (invention and additional information)

A47G 33/004 (2013.01); B44C 5/02 (2013.01)

Designated contracting state (EPC)

AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

EPO simple patent family

US 6029826 A 20000229; EP 1066782 A2 20010110; EP 1066782 A9 20010314; JP 2000325501 A 20001128

INPADOC legal status


2002-08-08 [REG DE 8566] DESIGNATED COUNTRY DE NOT LONGER VALID

- Ref Legal Event Code: 8566

2002-07-03 [18D] DEEMED TO BE WITHDRAWN

- Ref Legal Event Code: 18D

- Effective date: 20010922

2001-12-12 [AKX] PAYMENT OF DESIGNATION FEES

- Ref Legal Event Code: AKX

2001-03-21 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI

2001-01-10 [AK] DESIGNATED CONTRACTING STATES:

- Ref Legal Event Code: AK

- Designated State(s): AT BE CH CY DE DK ES FI FR GB GR IE IT LI LU MC NL PT SE

2001-01-10 [AX] REQUEST FOR EXTENSION OF THE EUROPEAN PATENT TO

- Ref Legal Event Code: AX

- Free Format Text: AL;LT;LV;MK;RO;SI